28.08.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.08.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.08.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.03.2023 |
Issuance of search results under Rule 164(2) EPC together with a communication from the examining division |
published on 26.04.2023 [2023/17] |
24.03.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.04.2023 [2023/17] |
24.03.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.04.2023 [2023/17] |
24.03.2023 |
First examination report |
|
20.12.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
23.08.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.10.2021 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] |
08.10.2021 |
Change - extension states |
published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] |
14.05.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
14.05.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
14.05.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
19.04.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.04.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.03.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.03.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.03.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
08.03.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.03.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
05.03.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.02.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.02.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
08.10.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.08.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|