EP3815103 - COMPUTER IMPLEMENTED METHOD AND MODULE FOR ACCESSING A DICOM WHOLE SLIDE IMAGE DATABASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.2022 [2022/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Servicio Andaluz de Salud Avda. de la Constitución 18 E-41071 Sevilla / ES | [2021/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE MENA GARCÍA, David Avenida de la Constitución, 18 41071 Sevilla / ES | 02 /
SÁNCHEZ GARCÍA, Alfonso Avenida de la Constitución, 18 41071 Sevilla / ES | 03 /
GARCÍA ROJO, Marcial Avenida de la Constitución, 18 41071 Sevilla / ES | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [2021/18] | Application number, filing date | 19748670.7 | 28.06.2019 | [2021/18] | WO2019EP67360 | Priority number, date | ES20180030651 | 29.06.2018 Original published format: ES 201830651 | [2021/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020002617 | Date: | 02.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3815103 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G16H30/40 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
G16H30/40 (EP,US);
G16H30/20 (US);
G06F16/51 (US);
G16H50/70 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] | Title | German: | COMPUTERIMPLEMENTIERTES VERFAHREN UND MODUL FÜR ZUGRIFF AUF EINE DICOM-DATENBANK FÜR WHOLE-SLIDE-IMAGE | [2021/18] | English: | COMPUTER IMPLEMENTED METHOD AND MODULE FOR ACCESSING A DICOM WHOLE SLIDE IMAGE DATABASE | [2021/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET MODULE MIS EN OEUVRE PAR ORDINATEUR POUR ACCÉDER À UNE BASE DE DONNÉES D'IMAGES COULISSANTES COMPLÈTES DICOM | [2021/18] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 21.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/41] | 08.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2469434 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0054] , [0 57] , [0 63] *; | [A]EP0933694 (PFU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0100] , [ 114] , [0 59] *; | [A]EP2860688 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US8086077 (EICHHORN OLE [US]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * | [A] - LI XIANGRUI ET AL, "The first step for neuroimaging data analysis: DICOM to NIfTI conversion", JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE METHODS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHER B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, (20160302), vol. 264, doi:10.1016/J.JNEUMETH.2016.03.001, ISSN 0165-0270, pages 47 - 56, XP029500119 [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [01.2] , [ 2.1] , [ 1.2] , [ 2.9] , [ 2.7] , [ 2.4] , [ 2.3]; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jneumeth.2016.03.001 |