EP3826762 - MASSIVELY PARALLEL ENZYMATIC SYNTHESIS OF NUCLEIC ACID STRANDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DNA Script Immeube Okabé 67 avenue de Fontainebleau 94270 Le Kremlin-Bicêtre / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/22] | For all designated states DNA Script Immeube Okabé 67 avenue de Fontainebleau 94270 Le Kremlin-Bicêtre / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORGAN, Adrian c.o. DNA SCRIPT 29 rue du Faubourg Saint-Jacques 75014 Paris / FR | 02 /
GODDRON, Xavier c.o. DNA SCRIPT 29 rue du Faubourg Saint-Jacques 75014 Paris / FR | 03 /
YBERT, Thomas 4 rue de la Vega 75012 Paris / FR | 04 /
NICHOL, Robert c.o. DNA SCRIPT Immeuble Okabé 67 avenue de Fontainebleau 94270 LE KREMLIN-BICÊTRE / FR | [2024/14] |
Former [2021/22] | 01 /
HORGAN, Adrian c.o. DNA SCRIPT 29 rue du Faubourg Saint-Jacques 75014 Paris / FR | ||
02 /
GODDRON, Xavier c.o. DNA SCRIPT 29 rue du Faubourg Saint-Jacques 75014 Paris / FR | |||
03 /
YBET, Thomas 4 rue de la Vega 75012 Paris / FR | |||
04 /
NICHOL, Robert c.o. DNA SCRIPT Immeuble Okabé 67 avenue de Fontainebleau 94270 LE KREMLIN-BICÊTRE / FR | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/22] | Cabinet Becker et Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 19748705.1 | 05.07.2019 | [2021/22] | WO2019EP68183 | Priority number, date | EP20180306000 | 23.07.2018 Original published format: EP 18306000 | [2021/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020020608 | Date: | 30.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3826762 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/00, G06N3/12, C12Q1/6874 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
B01J19/0046 (EP);
C40B50/06 (US);
C12N15/1068 (US);
G11C13/0019 (EP);
G11C13/0023 (EP);
G11C13/0069 (EP);
G16B50/00 (US);
B01J2219/00608 (EP);
B01J2219/00653 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/22] | Title | German: | MASSIV PARALLELE ENZYMATISCHE SYNTHESE VON NUKLEINSÄURESTRÄNGEN | [2021/22] | English: | MASSIVELY PARALLEL ENZYMATIC SYNTHESIS OF NUCLEIC ACID STRANDS | [2021/22] | French: | SYNTHÈSE ENZYMATIQUE MASSIVEMENT PARALLÈLE DE BRINS D'ACIDES NUCLÉIQUES | [2021/22] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/22] | 07.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2022 | Observations by third parties | 06.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]US2004238369 (SOUTHERN EDWIN MELLOR [GB], et al); | [A]US2007034513 (MAURER KARL [US], et al); | [A]WO2014014991 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]); | [XI]WO2016094512 (YLIFE TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US], et al); | [I]WO2017176541 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]); | [I]WO2017196783 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]); | [A]US2018201968 (CHEN MICHAEL C [GB], et al) | by applicant | US5126022 | US5367066 | US5436143 | US5474796 | US5498392 | US5587128 | US5667667 | US5700642 | US5739386 | US5763594 | US5830655 | US5858195 | WO9919717 | US6001229 | US6010607 | US6033546 | US6054034 | US6093302 | US6251595 | US6280595 | US6306599 | US6323043 | WO0224322 | US6399952 | US6426184 | US6444111 | US6613525 | US2003170698 | US2003186226 | US2004106728 | US2004238369 | US6921636 | US6960437 | US7057026 | US7223541 | US7276336 | US7491680 | US7534561 | US7544794 | US7838466 | WO2010134992 | US8895249 | US9075041 | WO2015159023 | US9267213 | US9339782 | EP3067809 | US9476080 | US2017141793 | WO2017216472 | US9874538 | US9910008 | US2018230509 | US2018265921 | WO2019030149 | US2019078065 | US2019078126 | other | US2004238369 | US2007034513 | US2009093381 | US2013341561 | WO2014014991 | WO2016094512 | WO2016139477 | WO2017176541 | WO2017196783 | WO2018102554 | US2018201968 | EP3826762 |