EP3837590 - AUTOMATION FIELD DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Endress+Hauser SE+Co. KG Hauptstrasse 1 79689 Maulburg / DE | [2021/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHÄUBLE, Harald Römerstraße 26A 79541 Lörrach / DE | 02 /
GERWIG, Simon Hägiweg 3 79650 Schopfheim / DE | 03 /
STRITTMATTER, Christian Im Schächle 14 79736 Rickenbach / DE | 04 /
BRUTSCHIN, Wolfgang Erlenweg 4 79650 Schopfheim / DE | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | Laufer, Michael, et al Endress + Hauser Group Services (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG Colmarer Straße 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | [2024/15] |
Former [2021/25] | Andres, Angelika Maria Endress+Hauser Group Services (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG Colmarer Straße 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 19748793.7 | 30.07.2019 | [2021/25] | WO2019EP70465 | Priority number, date | DE201810120108 | 17.08.2018 Original published format: DE102018120108 | [2021/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020035301 | Date: | 20.02.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3837590 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3837590 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/042, // G08C19/00, H04Q9/00 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
G05B19/0428 (EP,US);
G08C19/00 (EP,US);
H04Q9/00 (EP,US);
G05B2219/25428 (EP,US);
G05B2219/33192 (EP,US);
G05B2219/34313 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/25] | G05B19/042 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FELDGERÄT DER AUTOMATISIERUNGSTECHNIK | [2021/25] | English: | AUTOMATION FIELD DEVICE | [2021/25] | French: | APPAREIL DE TERRAIN DE LA TECHNIQUE DE L'AUTOMATISATION | [2021/25] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 28.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 10.04.2024 | [2024/44] | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2017167911 (FEHRENBACH JOSEF [DE], et al); | [XY]DE102016122714 (ENDRESS HAUSER WETZER GMBH CO KG [DE]) |