Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP3823664

Designated contracting statesAL 
 AT 
 BE 
 BG 
 CH 
CY 
 CZ 
 DE 
 DK 
 EE 
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 HR 
 HU 
 IE 
 IS 
 IT 
 LI 
 LT 
 LU 
 LV 
 MC 
 MK 
 MT 
 NL 
 NO 
 PL 
 PT 
 RO 
 RS 
 SE 
 SI 
 SK 
 SM 
 TR 
Validation statesKH 
 MA 
 MD 
TN 
Examination procedure03.12.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Entry into regional phase13.01.2021National basic fee paid 
13.01.2021Designation fee(s) paid 
13.01.2021Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
21.07.2022Renewal fee patent year 04
20.07.2023Renewal fee patent year 05
23.07.2024Renewal fee patent year 06
European patent granted08.01.2025
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:23.04.2021 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION WAS MADE
 
Event date:25.01.2020 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: THE INTERNATIONAL PUBLICATION HAS BEEN MADE
 
Event date:13.08.2019 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: UNKNOWN
 
Event date:26.05.2021 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20210113
 
Event date:26.05.2021 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:23.04.2021 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:18.01.2021 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: THE INTERNATIONAL PUBLICATION HAS BEEN MADE
 
Event date:21.01.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HK DE 40052527 HK
Code Expl.: REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG
 
Event date:22.04.2022 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: EXAMINATION IS IN PROGRESS
 
Event date:25.05.2022 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20220421
 
Event date:24.10.2024 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1
 
Event date:24.10.2024 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: GRANT OF PATENT IS INTENDED
 
Event date:27.11.2024 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20241025
 
Event date:04.12.2024 
Event description:GRANT FEE PAID
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3
 
Event date:06.12.2024 
Event description:(EXPECTED) GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210
 
Event date:06.12.2024 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: THE PATENT HAS BEEN GRANTED
 
Event date:18.12.2024 
Event description:OPT-OUT OF THE COMPETENCE OF THE UNIFIED PATENT COURT (UPC) REGISTERED
Free Format Text:CASE NUMBER: APP_60275/2024
Effective DATE:20241107
 
Event date:08.01.2025 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:08.01.2025 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:16.01.2025 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602019064614 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
 
Event date:15.01.2025 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:24.01.2025 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT SC4A 3823664 PT 20250124 T
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE
Free Format Text:AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION
Effective DATE:20250121
 
Event date:17.02.2025 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
Effective DATE:20250213
 
Event date:29.01.2025 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:05.03.2025 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL FP
Code Expl.: TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)
 
Event date:18.03.2025 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:04.03.2025 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FI FGE
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN FINLAND
 
Event date:02.04.2025 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 3010285 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20250402
 
Event date:18.07.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR TUEP P20250199T HR
Code Expl.: REQUEST FOR EP VALIDATION RECEIVED
 
Event date:09.04.2025 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SK T3 E 45928 SK
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAK
 
Event date:28.03.2025 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG MA VAGR 53168 MA B1
Code Expl.:+VALIDATION OF EP PATENT IN VALIDATION STATE [INFORMATION PROVIDED BY NATIONAL OFFICE]
 
Event date:15.04.2025 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG EE FG4A E024907 EE
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT VALID IN ESTONIA
Effective DATE:20250205
 
Event date:11.04.2025 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR T1PR P20250199 HR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN CROATIA