EP3830735 - TAMPER DETECTION IN INTEGRATED CIRCUITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARM Limited 110 Fulbourn Road Cherry Hinton, Cambridge CB1 9NJ / GB | [2021/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANAMADALA, Subbayya Chowdary c/o Arm Limited 110 Fulbourn Road Cherry Hinton Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB1 9NJ / GB | 02 /
RIEN, Mikael Yves Marie c/o Arm Limited 110 Fulbourn Road Cherry HInton Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB1 9NJ / GB | [2023/08] |
Former [2021/23] | 01 /
YANAMADALA, Subbayya Chowdary c/o Arm Limited 110 Fulbourn Road Cherry Hinton Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB1 9NJ / GB | ||
02 /
RIEN, Mikael Yves Marie c/o Arm Limited 110 Fulbourn Road Cherry HInton Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB1 9NJ / GB | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/23] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 19749400.8 | 29.07.2019 | [2021/23] | WO2019GB52117 | Priority number, date | US201816054099 | 03.08.2018 Original published format: US201816054099 | [2021/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020025939 | Date: | 06.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3830735 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3830735 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/87 | [2021/23] | CPC: |
G06F21/87 (EP,KR,US);
H01L23/576 (KR,US);
G01N27/045 (US);
G01N29/022 (US);
G01R31/2884 (KR,US);
G01R31/31725 (KR,US);
H03K3/0315 (KR,US);
H04L9/3278 (KR,US);
G01N2291/014 (US);
G01N2291/0426 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MANIPULATIONSERKENNUNG IN INTEGRIERTEN SCHALTUNGEN | [2021/23] | English: | TAMPER DETECTION IN INTEGRATED CIRCUITS | [2021/23] | French: | DÉTECTION D'EFFRACTION DANS DES CIRCUITS INTÉGRÉS | [2021/23] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 17.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 14.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.02.2023 | CZ | 22.02.2023 | DK | 22.02.2023 | EE | 22.02.2023 | ES | 22.02.2023 | FI | 22.02.2023 | HR | 22.02.2023 | IT | 22.02.2023 | LT | 22.02.2023 | LV | 22.02.2023 | MC | 22.02.2023 | NL | 22.02.2023 | PL | 22.02.2023 | RO | 22.02.2023 | RS | 22.02.2023 | SE | 22.02.2023 | SI | 22.02.2023 | SK | 22.02.2023 | SM | 22.02.2023 | NO | 22.05.2023 | GR | 23.05.2023 | IS | 22.06.2023 | PT | 22.06.2023 | IE | 29.07.2023 | LU | 29.07.2023 | BE | 31.07.2023 | CH | 31.07.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
IT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
MC | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SI | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
LU | 29.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
MC | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SI | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
LU | 29.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
MC | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SI | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
LU | 29.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
MC | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SI | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SI | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 22.02.2023 | |
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 22.02.2023 | |
LT | 22.02.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2007069875 (DOI BRYAN C [US]) [X] 1,8-19 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0037] * * figures 1-4 * [I] 2-7,20; | [XI]US7831873 (TRIMBERGER STEPHEN M [US], et al) [X] 1,8,14-18 * abstract * * column 4, line 4 - line 43 * * column 5, line 6 - column 8, line 48 * * column 9, line 30 - column 11, line 5 * * figures 2B, 3A, 3B, 4-9, 12 * [I] 2-7,9-13,19,20; | [XI]EP2876581 (NXP BV [NL]) [X] 1,8,14-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0060] * * figures 1A, 1B, 4 *[I] 2-7,9-13,19,20 |