Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021275012 | Global Dossier | 09.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NL2021310 | 16.07.2018 | WO2019NL50448 | 16.07.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7295938B | Global Dossier | 21.06.2023 | B2 | JP2021530295 | 11.11.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | NL2021310 | 16.07.2018 | WO2019NL50448 | 16.07.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN112689470B | Global Dossier | 23.02.2024 | B | CN112689470 | 20.04.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | NL2021310 | 16.07.2018 | WO2019NL50448 | 16.07.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3823516 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2023 | C0 | EP3823516 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2023 | B1 | EP3823516 | 26.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NL2021310 | 16.07.2018 | WO2019NL50448 | 16.07.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2960593T | 05.03.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | NL2021310 | 16.07.2018 | WO2019NL50448 | 16.07.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020017959 | Global Dossier | 23.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NL2021310 | 16.07.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NL2021310B | 24.01.2020 | B1 | Priority number | Date | NL2021310 | 16.07.2018 |