Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020162920 | ![]() | 13.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020162887 | ![]() | 13.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023373208 | ![]() | 23.11.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016956701 | 22.06.2020 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | US202318228321 | 31.07.2023 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12030312 | ![]() | 09.07.2024 | B2 | US2023382105 | 30.11.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202217961476 | 06.10.2022 | US202318448794 | 11.08.2023 | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US44507 | 31.07.2019 | US202016768541 | 29.05.2020 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11787173 | ![]() | 17.10.2023 | B2 | US2022379602 | 01.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202217884329 | 09.08.2022 | US202016768125 | 29.05.2020 | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US44494 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11787172 | ![]() | 17.10.2023 | B2 | US2021354450 | 18.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11780222 | ![]() | 10.10.2023 | B2 | US2023034348 | 02.02.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202217961476 | 06.10.2022 | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US44507 | 31.07.2019 | US202016768541 | 29.05.2020 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11613117 | ![]() | 28.03.2023 | B2 | US2021213732 | 15.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11590752 | ![]() | 28.02.2023 | B2 | US2021316550 | 14.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US44520 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11498326 | ![]() | 15.11.2022 | B2 | US2021206164 | 08.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US44446 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11491782 | ![]() | 08.11.2022 | B2 | US2021237434 | 05.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US44507 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11453212 | ![]() | 27.09.2022 | B2 | US2021213730 | 15.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US44494 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20210104153 | ![]() | 24.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US44494 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20210103576 | ![]() | 23.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102667043B | ![]() | 20.05.2024 | B1 | KR20210110663 | 08.09.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US44446 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102621224B | ![]() | 04.01.2024 | B1 | KR20210113274 | 15.09.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7174166B | ![]() | 17.11.2022 | B2 | JP2022518710 | 16.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7146101B | ![]() | 03.10.2022 | B2 | JP2022517634 | 09.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US44494 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7213360B | ![]() | 26.01.2023 | B2 | JP2022517409 | 08.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US44446 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL284655 | ![]() | 01.09.2024 | B2 | IL284655 | 01.05.2024 | B1 | IL284655 | 31.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US44446 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL284654 | ![]() | 01.05.2024 | B2 | IL284654 | 01.01.2024 | B1 | IL284654 | 31.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US44494 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL284609 | ![]() | 31.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL284608 | ![]() | 31.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4223541 | ![]() | 16.08.2023 | A3 | EP4223541 | 09.08.2023 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US44446 | 31.07.2019 | EP19750038 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4046802 | ![]() | 29.11.2023 | B1 | EP4046802 | 24.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19750041 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US44520 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3845386 | ![]() | 03.04.2024 | C0 | EP3845386 | ![]() | 03.04.2024 | B1 | EP3845386 | 07.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP21159248 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | EP19706138 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3717246 | ![]() | 16.06.2021 | B1 | EP3717246 | 07.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3710274 | ![]() | 01.06.2022 | B1 | EP3710274 | 23.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US44520 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3710272 | ![]() | 13.11.2024 | B1 | EP3710272 | 23.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US44494 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3710271 | ![]() | 31.05.2023 | B1 | EP3710271 | 23.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US44446 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3710270 | ![]() | 08.12.2021 | B1 | EP3710270 | 23.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115257184B | ![]() | 03.09.2024 | B | CN115257184 | 01.11.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | CN202210908038 | 06.02.2019 | CN201980090201 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113412197B | ![]() | 18.10.2022 | B | CN113412197 | 17.09.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US44446 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113412191B | ![]() | 14.10.2022 | B | CN113412191 | 17.09.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113382875B | ![]() | 10.01.2023 | B | CN113382875 | 10.09.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113382874B | ![]() | 06.12.2022 | B | CN113382874 | 10.09.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US44507 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113382873B | ![]() | 03.01.2023 | B | CN113382873 | 10.09.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US44494 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113302062B | ![]() | 28.03.2023 | B | CN113302062 | 24.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US44520 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3126920 | ![]() | 28.05.2024 | C | CA3126920 | 13.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US44494 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3126915 | ![]() | 13.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US44520 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3126914 | ![]() | 13.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US44507 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3126913 | ![]() | 07.11.2023 | C | CA3126913 | 13.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US44446 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3126693 | ![]() | 13.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3126596 | ![]() | 07.11.2023 | C | CA3126596 | 13.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2019428713B | ![]() | 30.03.2023 | B2 | AU2019428713 | 30.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2019428305B | ![]() | 19.01.2023 | B2 | AU2019428305 | 16.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US44446 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2019428297B | ![]() | 09.03.2023 | B2 | AU2019428297 | 30.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2019428241B | ![]() | 09.03.2023 | B2 | AU2019428241 | 23.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US44520 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2019428188B | ![]() | 04.05.2023 | B2 | AU2019428188 | 30.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US44507 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2019428071B | ![]() | 19.01.2023 | B2 | AU2019428071 | 23.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US44494 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3710273 | ![]() | 19.04.2023 | B1 | EP3710273 | 23.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US44507 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR117887 | 01.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112021014728 | 28.09.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US44446 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112021014760 | 28.09.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112021014778 | 05.10.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US44520 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112021015023 | 05.10.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112021015327 | 05.10.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US44507 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112021015360 | 05.10.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US44494 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CO2021011674 | 20.09.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3717246T | 19.07.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2887927T | 29.12.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2924338T | 06.10.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US44520 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2981066T | 07.10.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP21159248 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2021008849 | 08.09.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US44520 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2021008895 | 19.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2021008897 | 19.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US44494 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2021009110 | 14.09.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US44446 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2021009125 | 21.09.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US44507 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2021009127 | 10.09.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ779667 | 30.06.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3710274T | 12.09.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US44520 | 31.07.2019 | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3717246T | 08.11.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | EP19706138 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3845386T | 20.05.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP21159248 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT3717246T | 19.07.2021 | T | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SA521422693 | 03.03.2024 | B1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11202107300Y | 30.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI727534B | 11.05.2021 | B | TW202038411 | 16.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA202104418 | 28.09.2022 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2019IB16817 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019IB16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US44494 | 31.07.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020162972 | ![]() | 13.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020162971 | ![]() | 13.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020162970 | ![]() | 13.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020162969 | ![]() | 13.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2021001879 | 11.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2021001962 | 18.03.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SA521422685 | 10.01.2024 | B1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US16725 | 06.02.2019 | WO2019US16817 | 06.02.2019 |