|
05.04.2023 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2022 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2022 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.04.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2022 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2022 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.04.2022 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.04.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.01.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
55 |
|
14.01.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
55 |
|
10.11.2021 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2021 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
20.07.2021 |
Payment submission rejected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.2021 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.01.2021 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2021 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2020 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
31.08.2020 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
71 |
|
26.08.2020 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2020 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.08.2020 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
60 |
|
15.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2020 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.07.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
15.07.2020 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.2020 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2020 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.06.2020 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
04.06.2020 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
13.05.2020 |
Confirmation of effective date of early entry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.04.2020 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2020 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.12.2019 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.10.2019 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.10.2019 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
18.10.2019 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
18.10.2019 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.10.2019 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
20.08.2019 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
12.08.2019 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
12.08.2019 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
12.08.2019 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
8 |
|
12.08.2019 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
36 |
|
12.08.2019 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
15 |
|
12.08.2019 |
Fee calculation sheet for an international application |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
12.08.2019 |
Incoming letter related to ISA procedure |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
12.08.2019 |
Notification Concerning Payment of Prescribed Fees (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
12.08.2019 |
Notification of the International Application Number and of the International Filing Date (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
12.08.2019 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
12.08.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
12.08.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |