EP3841609 - PROFILED THERMODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pragmatic Printing Ltd National Centre for Printable Electronics Thomas Wright Way NETPark Sedgefield, Durham TS21 3FG / GB | [2021/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIES, Neil National Centre for Printable Electronics Thomas Wright Way NETPark Sedgefield Durham TS21 3FG / GB | 02 /
DEVENPORT, Stephen National Centre for Printable Electronics Thomas Wright Way NETPark Sedgefield Durham TS21 3FG / GB | 03 /
PRICE, Richard National Centre for Printable Electronics Thomas Wright Way NETPark Sedgefield Durham TS21 3FG / GB | [2021/26] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/26] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 19750142.2 | 30.07.2019 | [2021/26] | WO2019GB52134 | Priority number, date | GB20180013649 | 22.08.2018 Original published format: GB 201813649 | [2021/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020039164 | Date: | 27.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3841609 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/00, H05K3/32, H01L21/67 | [2021/26] | CPC: |
H05K3/323 (EP,US);
H05K13/0469 (GB,US);
B23K1/0016 (US);
B23K3/0471 (GB);
H01L21/50 (US);
H01L24/32 (EP,US);
H01L24/75 (EP);
H01L24/83 (EP,US);
H05K1/118 (US);
H01L2021/60277 (GB,US);
H01L2224/2929 (EP);
H01L2224/293 (EP);
H01L2224/32148 (US);
H01L2224/32227 (EP);
H01L2224/75303 (EP);
H01L2224/75305 (EP);
H01L2224/7531 (EP);
H01L2224/75651 (EP);
H01L2224/75983 (EP);
H01L2224/83203 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83851 (EP);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/2929, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/293, H01L2924/00014 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/26] | Title | German: | PROFILIERTE THERMODE | [2021/26] | English: | PROFILED THERMODE | [2021/26] | French: | THERMODE PROFILÉ | [2021/26] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/26] | 25.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP0032437 (AMERICAN COLDSET CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,5,7 * figures 5, 6 * * page 10, line 16 - page 12, line 20 * [I] 6,8-14; | [XI]DE10105164 (MICHALK MANFRED [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,7 * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0005] , [0 20] - [0033] * [I] 4,8-10,15-21; | [XI]JP2009032845 (SONY CHEM & INF DEVICE CORP) [X] 1-3,5,7 * figures 1, 2A, 2B * * paragraphs [0014] - [0038] *[I] 8-10,15-21 |