Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020374904 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019CN72238 | 17.01.2019 | CN201810146743 | 12.02.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3737191 | Global Dossier | 20.01.2021 | A4 | EP3737191 | 11.11.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019CN72238 | 17.01.2019 | CN201810146743 | 12.02.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019154039 | Global Dossier | 15.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201810146743 | 12.02.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110167149 | Global Dossier | 23.08.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201810146743 | 12.02.2018 |