Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
20.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
19.04.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
19.04.2024 | First examination report | |
12.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.01.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
17.12.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
29.09.2021 | Supplementary search report | published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] |
24.09.2021 | Change - classification | published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] |
24.09.2021 | Change - classification | published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] |
09.04.2021 | Change: Validation states | published on 12.05.2021 [2021/19] |
09.04.2021 | Change - extension states | published on 12.05.2021 [2021/19] |
26.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
02.03.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.11.2020 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
13.11.2020 | Request for examination filed | published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
19.10.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.08.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
20.07.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.07.2020 | Change - representative | |
18.07.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.08.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.08.2019 | New entry: applicant or inventor |