Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021038123 | Global Dossier | 11.02.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916967796 | 06.02.2019 | US201862626958 | 06.02.2018 | WO2019IB50945 | 06.02.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111937412B | Global Dossier | 03.06.2022 | B | CN111937412 | 13.11.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862626958 | 06.02.2018 | WO2019IB50945 | 06.02.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3750331 | Global Dossier | 27.10.2021 | A4 | EP3750331 | 16.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862626958 | 06.02.2018 | WO2019IB50945 | 06.02.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019155374 | Global Dossier | 15.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862626958 | 06.02.2018 |