EP3744032 - DETERMINATION OF REQUIREMENT OF UE PROCESSING TIME IN NR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEDIATEK INC. No. 1, Dusing 1st Rd. Hsinchu Science Park Hsinchu City 30078 / TW | [2020/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Xiu-Sheng c/o No. 1, Dusing 1st Rd. Hsinchu Science Park Hsinchu City 30078 / TW | [2021/02] |
Former [2020/49] | 01 /
LI, Xiu-Sheng c/o MEDIATEK INC. No. 1, Dusing 1st Rd. Hsinchu Science Park Hsinchu City 30078 / TW | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2020/49] | Application number, filing date | 19750862.5 | 02.02.2019 | [2020/49] | WO2019CN74537 | Priority number, date | US201862629187P | 12.02.2018 Original published format: US 201862629187 P | US201916264677 | 01.02.2019 Original published format: US201916264677 | [2020/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019154347 | Date: | 15.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3744032 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3744032 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/1607, H04L5/00, H04W72/04, H04W76/15 | [2023/20] | CPC: |
H04W76/15 (EP,US);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04L1/1671 (EP);
H04L1/1812 (US);
H04L5/001 (EP);
H04L5/0055 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/43] | H04L1/16, H04L1/18, H04L5/00, H04W72/04, H04W76/15 | ||
Former IPC [2020/49] | H04L1/18, H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESTIMMUNG DER ANFORDERUNG DER UE-VERARBEITUNGSZEIT IN NR | [2020/49] | English: | DETERMINATION OF REQUIREMENT OF UE PROCESSING TIME IN NR | [2020/49] | French: | DÉTERMINATION DU TEMPS DE TRAITEMENT D'UE NÉCESSAIRE DANS UN SYSTÈME NR | [2020/49] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 27.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/49] | 28.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.08.2023 | CZ | 16.08.2023 | DK | 16.08.2023 | EE | 16.08.2023 | ES | 16.08.2023 | FI | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | IT | 16.08.2023 | LT | 16.08.2023 | LV | 16.08.2023 | NL | 16.08.2023 | PL | 16.08.2023 | RO | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SE | 16.08.2023 | SI | 16.08.2023 | SK | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | PT | 18.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 16.08.2023 | |
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2016187066 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [I] 1-15* paragraphs [0083] - [0094]; figures 3,4 *; | [XI] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "On RRM requirements for sTTI and reduced processing time", vol. RAN WG4, no. Hangzhou; 20170515 - 20170519, (20170514), 3GPP DRAFT; R4-1705154-STTI-RRM-REQUIREMENTS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN4/Docs/, (20170514), XP051277296 [X] 1,2,6-9,13-15 * section 2 * [I] 3-5,10-12 | [XI] - NOKIA ET AL, "On maximum timing advance and processing time and {2,7} issues", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20171009 - 20171013, (20171008), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1717187, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20171008), XP051340378 [X] 1,2,6-9,13-15 * sections 2, 3 and 5 * [I] 3-5,10-12 | International search | [A]CN103580831 (BEIJING SAMSUNG COMM TECH RES, et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]CN105580304 (QUALCOMM INC) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2016277169 (PARK DONG HYUN [KR]) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [X]WO2016187066 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1-20 * description, paragraphs [0047]-[0111] * | by applicant | WO2016187066 | - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, On RRM requirements for sTTI and reduced processing time | - NOKIA, On maximum timing advance and processing time and {2, 7} issues |