EP3752671 - MULTI-LAYER PAPERMAKER'S FORMING FABRIC WITH AUXILIARY BOTTOM MD YARNS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huyck Licensco Inc. 14101 Capital Boulevard Youngsville, North Carolina 27596 / US | [2020/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WARD, Kevin 1474 Edith Drive Coldbrook, Nova Scotia B4R1A1 / CA | [2020/52] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [2024/14] |
Former [2020/52] | Parker, Andrew James Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19751104.1 | 04.02.2019 | [2020/52] | WO2019US16463 | Priority number, date | US201862629348P | 12.02.2018 Original published format: US 201862629348 P | [2020/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019156917 | Date: | 15.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3752671 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3752671 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | D21F1/00, D03D11/00, D03D3/04 | [2021/31] | CPC: |
D21F1/0045 (EP,US);
D21F1/0036 (KR,US);
B32B5/024 (US);
B32B5/26 (US);
B32B7/09 (US);
D03D1/00 (US);
D03D11/00 (US);
D03D3/04 (US);
D21F1/105 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/52] | D21F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRLAGIGE PAPIERMASCHINENBESPANNUNGEN MIT MD-HILFSFÄDEN AN DER UNTERSEITE | [2020/52] | English: | MULTI-LAYER PAPERMAKER'S FORMING FABRIC WITH AUXILIARY BOTTOM MD YARNS | [2020/52] | French: | TISSU DE FABRICATION DE PAPETERIE MULTICOUCHE AYANT DES FILS AUXILIAIRES INFÉRIEURS DANS LE SENS DE LA MACHINE | [2020/52] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 21.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/52] | 22.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 03.04.2024 | [2024/44] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1158089 (WEAVEXX CORP [US]); | [XI]US2003024590 (STONE RICHARD [CA]); | [A]US2007157987 (WARD KEVIN J [CA]) | International search | [A]US6179013 (GULYA THOMAS G [US]); | [A]EP0961853 (WEAVEXX CORP [US]); | [A]US2007157987 (WARD KEVIN J [CA]); | [A]KR20110103464 (WEAVEXX LLC [US]); | [A]US8251103 (BAUMANN OLIVER [DE]) | Examination | EP1158089 |