EP3751131 - WAVE POWER GENERATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Tokyo 3-1, Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | For all designated states Kawasaki Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1 Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 650-8670 / JP | [2020/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARUYAMA, Koki c/o The University of Tokyo 3-1, Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | 02 /
RHEEM, Chang-Kyu c/o The University of Tokyo 3-1, Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | 03 /
KOBAYASHI, Hidetaka c/o The University of Tokyo 3-1, Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | 04 /
KURIBAYASHI, Naoki Hyogo 650-8670 / JP | 05 /
TANAKA, Hideki Hyogo 650-8670 / JP | 06 /
TSUJI, Masahide Hyogo 650-8670 / JP | [2024/31] |
Former [2020/51] | 01 /
MARUYAMA, Koki c/o The University of Tokyo 3-1, Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | ||
02 /
RHEEM, Chang-Kyu c/o The University of Tokyo 3-1, Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | |||
03 /
KOBAYASHI, Hidetaka c/o The University of Tokyo 3-1, Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | |||
04 /
KURIBAYASHI, Naoki c/o The University of Tokyo 3-1, Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | |||
05 /
TANAKA, Hideki c/o The University of Tokyo 3-1, Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | |||
06 /
TSUJI, Masahide c/o The University of Tokyo 3-1, Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/51] | Application number, filing date | 19751634.7 | 06.02.2019 | [2020/51] | WO2019JP04195 | Priority number, date | JP20180020014 | 07.02.2018 Original published format: JP 2018020014 | [2020/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019156110 | Date: | 15.08.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3751131 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3751131 | Date: | 28.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F03B13/22, F03B13/18, F03B15/00 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
F03B15/00 (EP,US);
F03B13/1805 (KR);
F03B13/182 (EP,US);
F03B13/22 (KR);
F05B2260/406 (EP);
F05B2270/335 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2020/51] | F03B13/22, F03B13/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON WELLENENERGIE | [2020/51] | English: | WAVE POWER GENERATION SYSTEM | [2020/51] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GÉNÉRATION D'ÉNERGIE HOULOMOTRICE | [2020/51] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2020 | Translation filed | 18.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 18.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/51] | 16.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2379877 (AQUAMARINE POWER LTD [GB]); | [A]US2012313373 (SHIN SEUNG-HO [KR], et al); | [A]EP3267030 (WENG WEN-KAI [TW], et al) | International search | [A]JP2015108344 (UNIV TOKYO, et al); | [A]JP2016008511 (UNIV TOKYO, et al); | [A]JP2016010177 (UNIV TOKYO, et al); | [A]JP2017015068 (WATABE TOMIJI) | Examination | EP2379877 | by applicant | JP2015108344 |