EP3731641 - DOUGH COMPOSITION AND PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 07.06.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prester Foods Inc. PO Box 40060 Grasslands PO Regina, Saskatchewan S4W 0L3 / CA | [2020/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLADIWURA, Angela PO Box 40060 Grasslands PO Regina, Saskatchewan S4W 0L3 / CA | [2020/45] | Representative(s) | ip21 Ltd Central Formalities Department Suite 2 The Old Dairy Elm Farm Business Park Wymondham Norwich, Norfolk NR18 0SW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/45] | ip21 Ltd Central Formalities Department Lakeside 300 Old Chapel Way Broadland Business Park, Norwich Norfolk NR7 0WG / GB | Application number, filing date | 19751958.0 | 07.01.2019 | [2020/45] | WO2019CA50019 | Priority number, date | US201862627079P | 06.02.2018 Original published format: US 201862627079 P | [2020/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019153070 | Date: | 15.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3731641 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 15.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A21D2/36, A21D13/04, A21D13/045, A21D13/06, A21D2/26, A21D13/066 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
A21D13/066 (EP,US);
A21D13/045 (US);
A21D13/04 (EP);
A21D13/062 (EP,US);
A21D13/064 (EP);
A21D2/183 (EP,US);
A21D2/186 (EP,US);
A21D2/264 (EP);
A21D2/266 (US);
A21D2/36 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/45] | A21D2/36, A21D13/04, A21D13/045, A21D13/06, A21D2/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] | Title | German: | TEIGZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2020/45] | English: | DOUGH COMPOSITION AND PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURE | [2020/45] | French: | COMPOSITION DE PÂTE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2020/45] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 30.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 17.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008085354 (PAESCHKE TERESA MARIE [US], et al); | [Y]CN101238893 (XINJIANG TECH INST PHYSICS CAS [CN]); | [IY]WO2012076911 (BAKONYI-KISS ATTILA [HU], et al); | [Y]US2017150730 (CHARRAK SAMIR [DE], et al); | International search | [X]US2002127319 (GARE FRAN [US]); | [X]CA2579994 (KRAFT FOODS HOLDINGS INC [US]); | [X]US2015037389 (RAGOT PHILIPPE [FR], et al); | [X]US2017150730 (CHARRAK SAMIR [DE], et al) |