EP3814121 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING WORKPIECES COMPRISING FIBRE COMPOSITE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AZL Aachen GmbH Campus Boulevard 30 52074 Aachen / DE | For all designated states Rheinisch-Westfälische Technische Hochschule (RWTH) Aachen Templergraben 55 52062 Aachen / DE | [2021/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEILER, Thomas c/o Aachener Zentrum für integrativen Leichtbau (AZL) Campus Boulevard 30 52074 Aachen / DE | 02 /
SCHARES, Richard c/o Aachener Zentrum für integrativen Leichtbau (AZL) Campus Boulevard 30 52074 Aachen / DE | 03 /
WENDT, Albert c/o Aachener Zentrum für integrativen Leichtbau (AZL) Campus Boulevard 30 52074 Aachen / DE | 04 /
GIESGEN, Lazlo c/o Aachener Zentrum für integrativen Leichtbau (AZL) Campus Boulevard 30 52074 Aachen / DE | 05 /
TIMMERMANNS, Ruben Johannes Matthias c/o Aachener Zentrum für integrativen Leichtbau (AZL) Campus Boulevard 30 52074 Aachen / DE | [2023/31] |
Former [2021/18] | 01 /
WEILER, Thomas c/o Aachener Zentrum für integrativen Leichtbau AZL) Campus Boulevard 30 52074 Aachen / DE | ||
02 /
SCHARES, Richard c/o Aachener Zentrum für integrativen Leichtbau AZL) Campus Boulevard 30 52074 Aachen / DE | |||
03 /
WENDT, Albert c/o Aachener Zentrum für integrativen Leichtbau AZL) Campus Boulevard 30 52074 Aachen / DE | |||
04 /
GIESGEN, Lazlo c/o Aachener Zentrum für integrativen Leichtbau AZL) Campus Boulevard 30 52074 Aachen / DE | |||
05 /
TIMMERMANNS, Ruben Johannes Matthias c/o Aachener Zentrum für integrativen Leichtbau AZL) Campus Boulevard 30 52074 Aachen / DE | Representative(s) | Naeven, Ralf König Naeven Schmetz Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Eupener Straße 2a 52066 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/18] | Naeven, Ralf König Naeven Schmetz Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Kackertstraße 10 52072 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 19752080.2 | 25.06.2019 | [2021/18] | WO2019DE100586 | Priority number, date | DE201810115392 | 26.06.2018 Original published format: DE102018115392 | [2021/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020001702 | Date: | 02.01.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3814121 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3814121 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/38, B29C70/52, B29C70/20 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
B29C70/386 (EP);
B29C70/388 (KR,US);
B29C70/06 (KR);
B29C70/202 (EP,KR);
B29C70/34 (KR,US);
B29C70/54 (KR,US);
B32B38/1808 (KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/18] | B29C70/38, B29C70/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR PRODUKTION VON FASERVERBUNDWERKSTOFF AUFWEISENDEN WERKSTÜCKEN | [2021/18] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING WORKPIECES COMPRISING FIBRE COMPOSITE MATERIAL | [2021/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION DE PIÈCES COMPORTANT UN MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE RENFORCÉ DE FIBRES | [2021/18] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 25.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 20.12.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 21.12.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 21.12.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.01.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 02.08.2023 | |
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 02.08.2023 | |
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | GR | 03.11.2023 | |
IS | 02.12.2023 |