EP3833219 - ORAL HYGIENE TOOL, IN PARTICULAR A TOOTHBRUSH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/24] | ORAL HYGIENE PRODUCT, IN PARTICULAR TOOTHBRUSH | ||
[2022/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trisa Holding AG Kantonsstrasse 31 6234 Triengen / CH | [2021/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÄRTSCHI, Armin Langgasse 9 4652 Winznau / CH | [2021/24] | Representative(s) | Daub, Thomas Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub Bahnhofstrasse 5 88662 Überlingen / DE | [2021/24] | Application number, filing date | 19752139.6 | 31.07.2019 | [2021/24] | WO2019EP70702 | Priority number, date | EP20180187463 | 06.08.2018 Original published format: EP 18187463 | [2021/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020030511 | Date: | 13.02.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3833219 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3833219 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A46B5/02 | [2021/24] | CPC: |
A46B5/02 (EP);
A46B5/026 (EP,US);
A46B2200/1066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MUNDHYGIENEMITTEL, INSBESONDERE EINE ZAHNBÜRSTE | [2021/24] | English: | ORAL HYGIENE TOOL, IN PARTICULAR A TOOTHBRUSH | [2022/44] | French: | MOYEN D'HYGIÈNE BUCCALE, EN PARTICULIER BROSSE À DENTS | [2022/44] |
Former [2021/24] | ORAL HYGIENE PRODUCT, IN PARTICULAR TOOTHBRUSH | ||
Former [2021/24] | INSTRUMENT D'HYGIÈNE BUCCODENTAIRE, EN PARTICULIER BROSSE À DENTS | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/24] | 26.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 26.04.2023 | DK | 26.04.2023 | EE | 26.04.2023 | ES | 26.04.2023 | FI | 26.04.2023 | HR | 26.04.2023 | IT | 26.04.2023 | LT | 26.04.2023 | LV | 26.04.2023 | MC | 26.04.2023 | NL | 26.04.2023 | PL | 26.04.2023 | RO | 26.04.2023 | RS | 26.04.2023 | SE | 26.04.2023 | SI | 26.04.2023 | SK | 26.04.2023 | SM | 26.04.2023 | NO | 26.07.2023 | GR | 27.07.2023 | BE | 31.07.2023 | IE | 31.07.2023 | LU | 31.07.2023 | IS | 26.08.2023 | PT | 28.08.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 26.04.2023 | |
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SI | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
LU | 31.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | CZ | 26.04.2023 | |
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SI | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
LU | 31.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | CZ | 26.04.2023 | |
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
LU | 31.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | CZ | 26.04.2023 | |
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 26.04.2023 | |
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 26.04.2023 | |
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 26.04.2023 | |
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 26.04.2023 | |
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 26.04.2023 | |
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 26.04.2023 | |
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 26.04.2023 | |
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 26.04.2023 | |
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 26.04.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XAY]EP1532891 (TRISA HOLDING AG [CH]) [X] 1-5,9-13,16-19 * paragraphs [0017] - [0021]; figures 2-7 * [A] 15 [Y] 6-8,14; | [Y]EP1927454 (TRISA HOLDING AG [CH]) [Y] 6-8,14 * paragraph [0043]; figures 8-13 *; | [A]WO2014092672 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [A] 1-19* paragraph [0044]; figures 1,4 * |