EP3810432 - A METHOD FOR PROVIDING AN OBJECT WITH A UNIQUE MARK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INCM - Imprensa Nacional-Casa da Moeda, S.A. Avenida António José de Almeida 1000-042 Lisboa / PT | For all designated states Universidade de Coimbra Paço das Escolas 3004-531 Coimbra / PT | [2021/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MENDONÇA DA SILVA GONÇALVES, Nuno Miguel Travessa Nova da Rua António José de Almeida 5 1° andar 3000-046 Coimbra / PT | 02 /
SANTOS PATRÃO, Bruno André 4425-236 Pedrouços, Maia / PT | 03 /
MORAES VALLE CRUZ, Leandro W37DU, London / GB | 04 /
DIAS BARATA, Ricardo Jorge Rua Da Escola Nova, Nº67, 3º Frente 3045-057 Coimbra / PT | 05 /
DE ALMEIDA BARRETO, João Pedro 3045-057 Coimbra / PT | 06 /
FREIRE DUARTE, João Pedro Rua Capitão Pereirinha, Nr. 95, R/C DRT 3040-020 Coimbra / PT | 07 /
PAULO MONTEIRO, Renato Rua Fausto Figueiredo, Nr.1 Alva De Pataias 2445-205 Pataias / PT | 08 /
FERREIRA SARAIVA DA MOUTA DIAS, João Paulo IPN - Rua Pedro Nunes 3030-199 Coimbra / PT | 09 /
CAVALEIRO RODRIGUES DE CARVALHO, Albano Augusto IPN - Rua Pedro Nunes 3030 199 Coimbra / PT | [2023/42] |
Former [2021/17] | 01 /
MENDONÇA DA SILVA GONÇALVES, Nuno Miguel Rua Dos Soeiros, 309, 3º Esq. 1500-580 Lisboa / PT | ||
02 /
SANTOS PATRÃO, Bruno André Rua Alto De S. João Nº37 1º Direito 3030-001 Coimbra / PT | |||
03 /
MORAES VALLE CRUZ, Leandro Rua Fonte Do Bispo Nº136 8ºF 3030-243 Coimbra / PT | |||
04 /
DIAS BARATA, Ricardo Jorge Rua Da Escola Nova, Nº67, 3º Frente 3045-057 Coimbra / PT | |||
05 /
DE ALMEIDA BARRETO, João Pedro Rua António José De Almeida, 295, 1º Esq 3000-045 Coimbra / PT | |||
06 /
FREIRE DUARTE, João Pedro Rua Capitão Pereirinha, Nr. 95, R/C DRT 3040-020 Coimbra / PT | |||
07 /
PAULO MONTEIRO, Renato Rua Fausto Figueiredo, Nr.1 Alva De Pataias 2445-205 Pataias / PT | |||
08 /
FERREIRA SARAIVA DA MOUTA DIAS, João Paulo IPN - Rua Pedro Nunes 3030-199 Coimbra / PT | |||
09 /
CAVALEIRO RODRIGUES DE CARVALHO, Albano Augusto IPN - Rua Pedro Nunes 3030 199 Coimbra / PT | Representative(s) | Monteiro Alves, Inês Alameda Dos Oceanos, Nº 41K-21 Parque das Nações 1990-207 Lisboa / PT | [2021/17] | Application number, filing date | 19752554.6 | 19.06.2019 | [2021/17] | WO2019IB55177 | Priority number, date | PT20180110798 | 22.06.2018 Original published format: PT 2018110798 | [2021/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019244081 | Date: | 26.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3810432 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3810432 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B41M3/00, B41M3/14, B41M7/00, B44F1/02, B44F5/00, B41M5/26 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
B41M7/0081 (EP);
B41M3/00 (EP);
B41M3/14 (EP);
B41M5/26 (EP);
B41M7/00 (EP);
B44F1/02 (EP);
B44F5/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINES OBJEKTES MIT EINER EINDEUTIGEN MARKIERUNG | [2021/17] | English: | A METHOD FOR PROVIDING AN OBJECT WITH A UNIQUE MARK | [2021/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉLIVRER À UN OBJET UNE MARQUE UNIQUE | [2021/17] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 14.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.09.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | RO | 18.10.2023 | SM | 18.10.2023 | IS | 18.02.2024 | [2024/35] |
Former [2024/33] | SM | 18.10.2023 | |
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | IS | 18.02.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE102008015466 (INFORMIUM AG [DE]); | [XI]US2016376674 (SOLOWAY DANIEL DAVID [US]); | [XI]US2018029304 (PAULI UWE [CH], et al) |