EP3826656 - COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING AN AMERICAN CRANBERRY EXTRACT AND PHOSPHOLIPIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Indena S.p.A. Viale Ortles, 12 20139 Milano / IT | [2021/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARPINI, Sabrina c/o Indena S.p.A. Viale Ortles, 12 20139 Milano / IT | 02 /
MOMBELLI, Giacomo c/o Indena S.p.A. Viale Ortles, 12 20139 Milano / IT | 03 /
MORAZZONI, Paolo c/o Indena S.p.A. Viale Ortles, 12 20139 Milano / IT | 04 /
PETERLONGO, Federico c/o Indena S.p.A. Viale Ortles, 12 20139 Milano / IT | 05 /
RIVA, Antonella c/o Indena S.p.A. Viale Ortles, 12 20139 Milano / IT | 06 /
RONCHI, Massimo c/o Indena S.p.A. Viale Ortles, 12 20139 Milano / IT | [2021/22] | Representative(s) | Bianchetti & Minoja with Trevisan & Cuonzo IPS SRL Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2022/34] | Bianchetti & Minoja SRL Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2021/22] | Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 19752560.3 | 23.07.2019 | [2021/22] | WO2019IB56261 | Priority number, date | IT20180007440 | 23.07.2018 Original published format: IT201800007440 | [2021/22] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020021439 | Date: | 30.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3826656 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3826656 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K36/45, A61P31/00 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
A61K36/45 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/0053 (IL,KR);
A23L29/05 (IL,KR);
A23L33/105 (IL,KR);
A61K31/685 (IL,US);
A61K47/24 (IL,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT EINEM EXTRAKT AUS DER AMERIKANISCHEN PREISELBEERE UND PHOSPHOLIPIDEN | [2021/22] | English: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING AN AMERICAN CRANBERRY EXTRACT AND PHOSPHOLIPIDS | [2021/22] | French: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT UN EXTRAIT DE CANNEBERGE AMÉRICAINE ET DES PHOSPHOLIPIDES | [2021/22] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/22] | 16.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 24.08.2022 | EE | 24.08.2022 | HR | 24.08.2022 | LT | 24.08.2022 | LV | 24.08.2022 | MC | 24.08.2022 | RS | 24.08.2022 | SK | 24.08.2022 | SM | 24.08.2022 | IS | 24.12.2022 | [2024/14] |
Former [2023/29] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | EE | 24.08.2022 | |
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | HR | 24.08.2022 | |
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | HR | 24.08.2022 | |
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | HR | 24.08.2022 | |
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | LT | 24.08.2022 | |
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | LT | 24.08.2022 | |
RS | 24.08.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2010150051 (LIPOID GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * claims 1,11 ** page 3, paragraph l *; | [A] - LEDDA A ET AL, "Supplementation with high titer cranberry extract (Anthocran ) for the prevention of recurrent urinary tract infections in elderly men suffering from moderate prostatic hyperplasia: a pilot study", EUROPEAN REVIEW FOR MEDICAL AND PHARMACOLOGICAL SCIENCESITALY, VERDUCI EDITORE SRL, IT, (20161130), vol. 20, no. 24, ISSN 2284-0729, pages 5205 - 5209, XP009509047 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | [A] - LEDDA A ET AL, "Meriva , a lecithinized curcumin delivery system, in the control of benign prostatic hyperplasia: a pilot, product evaluation registry study", vol. 54, no. 1 Suppl 4, ISSN 1827-1898, (20121130), pages 17 - 22, PANMINERVA MEDICA,, URL: https://www.researchgate.net/publication/279556035_MerivaR_a_lecithinized_curcumin_delivery_system_in_the_control_of_benign_prostatic_hyperplasia_A_pilot_product_evaluation_registry_study, (20121201), XP009510260 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * |