EP3817692 - VASCULAR AND AORTIC GRAFTS AND DEPLOYMENT TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aquedeon Medical, Inc. 452 Oakmead Parkway Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | [2021/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PALERMO, Thomas J. 452 Oakmead Parkway Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | 02 /
LEE, Pin-Hsuan 452 Oakmead Parkway Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | 03 /
JEN, Jimmy 452 Oakmead Parkway Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | [2021/19] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/19] | Cordy, Nicole Jessica Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 7th Floor Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 19752588.4 | 03.07.2019 | [2021/19] | WO2019US40566 | Priority number, date | US201862693897P | 03.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862693897 P | [2021/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020010237 | Date: | 09.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3817692 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/97 | [2021/19] | CPC: |
A61F2/97 (EP,IL,KR);
A61F2/07 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61F2/064 (EP,IL);
A61F2/89 (IL,US);
A61F2/90 (IL,US);
A61F2/958 (IL,KR,US);
A61F2/962 (EP,IL,US);
A61F2/966 (KR);
A61L31/04 (KR);
A61F2002/061 (EP,IL,KR);
A61F2002/9511 (IL,KR,US);
A61F2220/0008 (EP,IL,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/19] | Title | German: | GEFÄSS- UND AORTENTRANSPLANTATE UND INSTRUMENT ZU IHRER FREISETZUNG | [2021/19] | English: | VASCULAR AND AORTIC GRAFTS AND DEPLOYMENT TOOL | [2021/19] | French: | GREFFONS VASCULAIRES ET AORTIQUES ET OUTIL DE DÉPLOIEMENT | [2021/19] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/19] | 04.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/25] | 21.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9827894 (PROGRAFT MEDICAL INC [US]); | [X]US2003139805 (HOLMBERG WILLIAM R [US], et al); | [X]US2008132993 (RASMUSSEN ERIK E [DK], et al); | [X]US2013282103 (MADJAROV JEKO METODIEV [US], et al); | [X]US8641752 (HOLM BRIAN C [US], et al); | [X]DE102013106463 (JOTEC GMBH [DE]); | [X]US9763819 (SONDREAAL MATTHEW G [US]) | by applicant | US4580568 |