EP3837484 - THERMAL ACCUMULATOR CONTAINING A PCM, AND REFRIGERATED CONTAINER EQUIPED WITH SAID THERMAL ACCUMULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biofreshtec S.L. Sequia de Rascanya 2-4 46210 Picanya (Valencia) / ES | [2021/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUILLEN MARTÍNEZ, Javier Camino de Moncon n°21 33416 Modella-Corvera (Asturias) / ES | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | Curell Suñol S.L.P. Muntaner 240, 4º 2ª 08021 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2021/25] | Curell Suñol S.L.P. Via Augusta 21 08006 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 19752711.2 | 14.08.2019 | [2021/25] | WO2019EP71799 | Priority number, date | EP20180382615 | 17.08.2018 Original published format: EP 18382615 | [2021/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020035525 | Date: | 20.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3837484 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F28D20/02, F25D3/00, F25D11/00 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
F28D20/021 (EP,US);
C09K5/041 (US);
F25D11/003 (EP);
F25D11/006 (EP);
F28D2020/0026 (EP,US);
F28D2020/0086 (EP,US);
Y02E60/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] | Title | German: | THERMISCHER AKKUMULATOR MIT EINEM PCM UND MIT DIESEM THERMISCHEN AKKUMULATOR AUSGESTATTETER KÜHLBEHÄLTER | [2021/25] | English: | THERMAL ACCUMULATOR CONTAINING A PCM, AND REFRIGERATED CONTAINER EQUIPED WITH SAID THERMAL ACCUMULATOR | [2021/25] | French: | ACCUMULATEUR THERMIQUE CONTENANT UN PCM, ET CONTENEUR RÉFRIGÉRÉ ÉQUIPÉ DUDIT ACCUMULATEUR THERMIQUE | [2021/25] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 25.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/11] | 26.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2022/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]EP1236960 (HIGH TECHNOLOGY PARTICIPATION [LU]) [YD] 16-18 * abstract *; | [IY]US2016109187 (HOUDEK PAVEL [CZ], et al) [I] 1-3,9,11-15 * abstract * [Y] 4-8,10,16-18; | [Y]US2328189 (BRACE GEORGE A, et al) [Y] 4-8,10 * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | EP1236960 | WO2014178015 |