EP3830124 - ANTI-CXCR2 ANTIBODIES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cephalon LLC 145 Brandywine Parkway West Chester, PA 19380 / US | [2022/44] |
Former [2021/23] | For all designated states Cephalon, Inc. 1090 Horsham Road North Wales, Pennsylvania 19454 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Doris, Shim Siew P.O. Box 113 Yagoona, 2199 / AU | 02 /
POULTON, Lynn, Dorothy Level 2, 37 Epping Road Macquarie Park, 2113 / AU | 03 /
CLARKE, Adam Level 2, 37 Epping Road Macquarie Park, 2113 / AU | 04 /
LAINE, David, Jose Simon Level 2, 37 Epping Road Macquarie Park, 2113 / AU | 05 /
POLLARD, Matthew Level 2, 37 Epping Road Macquarie Park, 2113 / AU | 06 /
COOKSEY, Bridget, Ann Level 2, 37 Epping Road Macquarie Park, 2113 / AU | 07 /
DOYLE, Anthony Level 2, 37 Epping Road Macquarie Park, 2113 / AU | 08 /
GILL, Jason, William Level 2, 37 Epping Road Macquarie Park, 2113 / AU | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/23] | Holland, David Christopher Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 19752827.6 | 31.07.2019 | [2021/23] | WO2019US44314 | Priority number, date | US201862713095P | 01.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862713095 P | [2021/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020028479 | Date: | 06.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3830124 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61P11/06, A61K39/00 | [2021/23] | CPC: |
C07K16/2866 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P11/00 (IL,US);
A61P11/06 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K2039/505 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/395 (US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,IL,US);
C07K2317/55 (KR);
C07K2317/565 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K2317/76 (EP,IL,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Title | German: | ANTI-CXCR2-ANTIKÖRPER UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2021/23] | English: | ANTI-CXCR2 ANTIBODIES AND USES THEREOF | [2021/23] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-CXCR2 ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2021/23] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 26.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IY]US5440021 (CHUNTHARAPAI ANAN [US], et al); | [AD]WO2008151081 (OMT INC [US], et al); | [IY]WO2012062713 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [IY]WO2013168108 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [IY]WO2014170317 (MORPHOSYS AG [DE]); | [IPY]WO2018154391 (UNIV MONASH [AU]); | by applicant | WO8801649 | WO9201047 | WO9413804 | WO9844001 | WO2008151081 | WO2009085462 | US8241630 | WO2014170317 | WO2015169811 |