02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
26.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
05.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] |
17.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
24.11.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] |
21.11.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
21.10.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
21.10.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
25.08.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.06.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.06.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.07.2023 [2023/28] |
09.06.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.07.2023 [2023/28] |
09.06.2023 |
Change - French title |
published on 12.07.2023 [2023/28] |
26.08.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.10.2021 |
Change - extension states |
published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] |
22.10.2021 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] |
25.08.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.05.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
28.05.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
28.05.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
03.05.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.04.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
11.01.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.12.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.12.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.12.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
14.12.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.02.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.02.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
23.10.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.08.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|