EP3840595 - CONSUMABLE PRODUCT FOR AN AEROSOL GENERATING DEVICE AND METHODS OF FILLING AND MANUFACTURING A CONSUMABLE PRODUCT FOR AN AEROSOL GENERATING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Unitary effect registered Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for unitary effect filed Status updated on 26.12.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | New entry: Payment of renewal fee | Proprietor(s) | For all participating member states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BESSO, Clement Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | 02 /
JORDIL, Yves Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | 03 /
TRITZ, Dorothy Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | 04 /
BATISTA, Rui Nuno Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | 05 /
GUNDUZ, Nazan Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | 06 /
VENOUIL, Joanne Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2021/26] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 19753109.8 | 19.08.2019 | [2021/26] | WO2019EP72103 | Procedural language | EN | (Principal) place of business Tooltip on the date of filing | Principal place of businessTooltip | Unitary Patent Protection | 27.12.2023 | Date of request for unitary effect [2024/05] | 09.01.2024 | Decision on the request for unitary effect: Positive [2024/06] | 09.01.2024 | Date of registration [2024/06] | 27.12.2023 | Date of legal effect [2024/06] | Member States covered by Unitary Tooltip Patent Protection | 09.01.2024 | AT, BE, BG, DE, DK, EE, FI, FR, IT, LT, LU, LV, MT, NL, PT, SE, SI [2024/06] | Publication | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3840595 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Renewal fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee unitary effect year 06 |