Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
10.12.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.01.2022 [2022/02] |
26.10.2021 | Supplementary search report | published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] |
22.10.2021 | Change - classification | published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] |
22.10.2021 | Change - classification | published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] |
16.04.2021 | Change: Validation states | published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
16.04.2021 | Change - extension states | published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
15.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
24.02.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.02.2021 | Change - applicant | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
20.11.2020 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] |
20.11.2020 | Request for examination filed | published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] |
26.10.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.09.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.09.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.08.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
10.08.2020 | Change - representative | |
10.08.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
06.07.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
06.05.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.08.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.08.2019 | New entry: applicant or inventor |