EP3755044 - BASE STATION DEVICE, TERMINAL DEVICE, AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.01.2022 [2022/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHARP Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai-City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/11] | For all designated states SHARP Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai-City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | ||
Former [2020/52] | For all designated states SHARP Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai-City Osaka 590-8522 / JP | ||
For all designated states FG INNOVATION COMPANY LIMITED Flat 2623, 26/F Tuen Mun Central Square 22 Hoi Wing Road, Tuen Mun New Territories, HK / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHUCHI, Wataru c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8522 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Shouichi c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8522 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIMURA, Tomoki c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8522 / JP | 04 /
LIU, Liqing c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8522 / JP | 05 /
LEE, Taewoo c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8522 / JP | [2020/52] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2020/52] | Application number, filing date | 19753815.0 | 14.02.2019 | [2020/52] | WO2019JP05308 | Priority number, date | JP20180024863 | 15.02.2018 Original published format: JP 2018024863 | [2020/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019160027 | Date: | 22.08.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3755044 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/15, H04L1/18, H04L5/00, H04W72/04 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
H04W76/15 (EP,US);
H04L5/14 (EP,US);
H04L1/1812 (US);
H04L1/1822 (EP);
H04L1/1861 (EP);
H04L1/1864 (EP);
H04L27/2602 (EP);
H04L5/001 (EP);
H04L5/0032 (EP);
H04L5/0055 (EP);
H04L5/0092 (EP);
H04L5/1469 (EP);
H04W72/0446 (EP);
H04L5/0023 (EP);
H04L5/0048 (EP);
H04W72/23 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/52] | H04W28/04, H04W16/32, H04W28/06, H04W72/04, H04W72/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] | Title | German: | BASISSTATIONSVORRICHTUNG, ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN | [2020/52] | English: | BASE STATION DEVICE, TERMINAL DEVICE, AND METHOD | [2020/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE STATION DE BASE, DISPOSITIF TERMINAL, ET PROCÉDÉ | [2020/52] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2020 | Translation filed | 13.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 13.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/52] | 15.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y] - INTEL CORPORATION, "Proposed changes for NR-LTE co-existence related specification descriptions", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1 Meeting AH1801 R1-1800339, (20180113), pages 1 - 4, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_AH/NR_AH_1801/Docs/R1-1800339.zip, (20190312), XP051384798 [Y] 1-4 | [Y] - 3GPP, "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Physical layer procedures (Release 14)", 3GPP TS 36.213 V14.5.0, (20180110), pages 238 - 241, 377-378, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Specs/archive/36_series/36.213/36213-e50.zip, (20190312), XP051392575 [Y] 1-4 | [Y] - SAMSUNG, "Review issue list for TS 36. 331 EN-DC ASN. 1 freeze", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG2 NR Ad Hoc 1801 R2-1801593, (20180127), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_AHs/2018_01_NR/Docs/R2-1801593.zip, (20190312), XP051387030 [Y] 2, 4 | by applicant | JP2018024863 |