EP3753956 - ANTIGEN-BINDING MOLECULE AND COMBINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2020 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, 5-chome Ukima Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8543 / JP | [2020/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IGAWA, Tomoyuki c/o Chugai Pharmabody Research Pte. Ltd. 3, Biopolis Drive, 07-11 to 16 Synapse, 138623 / SG | 02 /
HIRONIWA, Naoka c/o Chugai Pharmabody Research Pte. Ltd. 3, Biopolis Drive, 07-11 to 16 Synapse, 138623 / SG | 03 /
KAMIKAWAJI, Shogo c/o CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 200, Kajiwara Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa 247-8530 / JP | 04 /
KIBAYASHI, Tatsuya c/o CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 135, Komakado 1-chome Gotemba-shi, Shizuoka 412-8513 / JP | 05 /
SAVORY, Nasa c/o CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 135, Komakado 1-chome Gotemba-shi, Shizuoka 412-8513 / JP | 06 /
MIMOTO, Futa c/o Chugai Pharmabody Research Pte. Ltd. 3, Biopolis Drive, 07-11 to 16 Synapse, 138623 / SG | [2020/52] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2020/52] | Application number, filing date | 19754024.8 | 14.02.2019 | [2020/52] | WO2019JP05258 | Priority number, date | JP20180024009 | 14.02.2018 Original published format: JP 2018024009 | [2020/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019160007 | Date: | 22.08.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3753956 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/42, C07K16/00, C07K16/28, C12N15/13 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
C07K16/4208 (EP);
C07K16/2809 (US);
A61K2239/31 (EP,US);
A61K2239/38 (EP,US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,US);
A61K39/464402 (EP,US);
A61K39/464406 (EP,US);
A61K39/464474 (EP,US);
C07K16/2815 (EP);
C07K16/303 (EP);
C07K16/32 (EP);
C07K16/44 (EP);
C12N5/0634 (EP,US);
C07K2317/30 (EP);
C07K2317/31 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] | Title | German: | ANTIGENBINDENDES MOLEKÜL UND KOMBINATION | [2020/52] | English: | ANTIGEN-BINDING MOLECULE AND COMBINATION | [2020/52] | French: | MOLÉCULE DE LIAISON À L'ANTIGÈNE ET COMBINAISON | [2020/52] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2020 | Translation filed | 08.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 08.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/52] | 20.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2007042261 (MICROMET AG [DE], et al); | [AD]WO2008119565 (MICROMET AG [DE], et al); | [A]EP2857420 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]); | [AD]WO2016020444 (AFFIMED GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP3070168 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP3078744 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]); | [T]WO2020027330 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]); | International search | [A]WO2009142221 (OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2015083764 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]WO2017159287 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]); | by applicant | WO9627011 | WO2006106905 | WO2007042261 | WO2007110205 | WO2008119565 | WO2009025846 | WO2009089004 | WO2009142221 | WO2010129304 | WO2011143545 | WO2012058768 | WO2012073985 | WO2013180200 | WO2014084607 | WO2014104165 | WO2015046554 | WO2015083764 | WO2015156268 | WO2016020444 |