EP3752925 - VARIABLE UPGRADABLE MULTI-USER PORT OF A REMOTE ANTENNA UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CommScope Technologies LLC 1100 CommScope Place SE Hickory, NC 28602 / US | [2020/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FACKLER, Karl-Heinz c/o CommScope Technologies LLC 1100 CommScope Place SE Hickory, North Carolina 28602 / US | 02 /
BERNDORFER, Joachim c/o CommScope Technologies LLC 1100 CommScope Place SE Hickory, North Carolina 28602 / US | 03 /
STEFANIK, Joerg c/o CommScope Technologies LLC 1100 CommScope Place SE Hickory, North Carolina 28602 / US | [2021/07] |
Former [2020/52] | 01 /
FACKLER, Karl-Heinz c/o CommScope Technologies LLC 1100 CommScope Place SE Hickory, North Carolina 28602 / US | ||
02 /
BERNDORFER, Joachim c/o CommScope Technologies LLC 1100 CommScope Place SE Hickory, Minnesota 28602 / US | |||
03 /
STEFANIK, Joerg c/o CommScope Technologies LLC 1100 CommScope Place SE Hickory, North Carolina 28602 / US | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/52] | Parker, Andrew James Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19754715.1 | 13.02.2019 | [2020/52] | WO2019US17844 | Priority number, date | US201862710473P | 16.02.2018 Original published format: US 201862710473 P | [2020/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019160951 | Date: | 22.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3752925 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/40, H05K5/00 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
H04W88/085 (EP,US);
H04W16/20 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] | Title | German: | VARIABLER AUFRÜSTBARER MEHRBENUTZERPORT EINER ENTFERNTEN ANTENNENEINHEIT | [2020/52] | English: | VARIABLE UPGRADABLE MULTI-USER PORT OF A REMOTE ANTENNA UNIT | [2020/52] | French: | PORT MULTI-UTILISATEUR ÉVOLUTIF VARIABLE D'UNE UNITÉ D'ANTENNE À DISTANCE | [2020/52] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 17.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/52] | 25.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2469718 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [X] 1,8 * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0033]; figures 2-3 * * paragraph [0042] * [I] 2-7,9-13; | [A]WO2012115843 (CORNING CABLE SYS LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-13* paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0068]; figure 6 *; | [XI]US2013201916 (KUMMETZ THOMAS [DE], et al) [X] 1,8 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraphs [0058] , [ 0070] - [0072] * [I] 2-7,9-13; | [XI]US2014308043 (HEIDLER CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) [X] 1,8 * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0072]; figure 6 * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0093] * [I] 2-7,9-13; | [XI]WO2017189406 (CORNING OPTICAL COMMUNICATIONS LLC [US]) [X] 1,8 * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0099]; figures 3-5 * [I] 2-7,9-13 | International search | [Y]US2003048794 (SATO KAZUHIKO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-20 * See claims 3, 5, 27. *; | [A]US2003087672 (KATTUKARAN PAUL [SG], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0027]-[0029]; and figure 4. *; | [Y]US2012084472 (LOCASCIO TIMOTHY R [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0022], [0027]-[0028]; claims 2, 6, 8; and figure 2. *; | [A]KR20130095694 (LG UPLUS CORP [KR]) [A] 1-20* See paragraphs [0053]-[0057]; and figure 5. *; | [A]US2014308043 (HEIDLER CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 | by applicant | EP2469718 | US2013201916 | US2014308043 | WO2017189406 |