EP3837524 - AUTOMATED PREPARATION OF SAMPLE MATERIALS FOR CHEMICAL ANALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Accroma Labtec AG Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | [2021/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAFNER, Stefan Hauptstrasse 29 4444 Rümlingen / CH | 02 /
FEDERER, Beat Schillingstrasse 17 3005 Bern / CH | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | Latscha Schöllhorn Partner AG Grellingerstrasse 60 4052 Basel / CH | [2021/25] | Application number, filing date | 19755569.1 | 13.08.2019 | [2021/25] | WO2019EP71638 | Priority number, date | CH20180000983 | 13.08.2018 Original published format: CH 9832018 | [2021/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020035467 | Date: | 20.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3837524 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3837524 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/28, B02C17/00 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
G01N1/286 (EP,US);
B02C17/06 (US);
B02C17/182 (US);
B02C2017/065 (US);
G01N2001/2866 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISIERTE HERSTELLUNG VON PROBENMATERIALIEN FÜR CHEMISCHE ANALYSE | [2021/25] | English: | AUTOMATED PREPARATION OF SAMPLE MATERIALS FOR CHEMICAL ANALYSIS | [2021/25] | French: | PRÉPARATION AUTOMATISÉE DE MATÉRIAUX D'ÉCHANTILLONS POUR ANALYSE CHIMIQUE | [2021/25] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 11.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 04.10.2023 | ES | 04.10.2023 | HR | 04.10.2023 | PL | 04.10.2023 | RO | 04.10.2023 | RS | 04.10.2023 | SK | 04.10.2023 | SM | 04.10.2023 | NO | 04.01.2024 | GR | 05.01.2024 | IS | 04.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RO | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 04.10.2023 | |
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 04.10.2023 | |
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 05.01.2024 | |
IS | 04.02.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4505433 (SELENKE WILLIAM M [US]) [A] 1-21 * column 7, line 26 - line 47 ** figure 2 *; | [XA]US2009101738 (STITT MARK [DE], et al) [X] 13-21 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0057] * * figures 1-4 * [A] 1-12; | [IA]WO2013156923 (RPD TOOL AG [CH]) [I] 13-21 * the whole document * [A] 1-12; | [XA] - Anonymous, "INSTAGRAM ACCROMA", (20171108), URL: https://www.instagram.com/p/BbOlbQInV1o/, (20181206), XP055531184 [X] 13-21 * the whole document * [A] 1-12 |