EP4014470 - SENSOR DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING A SENSOR PARAMETER SETTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VEGA Grieshaber KG Hauptstr. 5 77709 Wolfach / DE | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISENMANN, Andreas In der Zillmatt 14 77716 Haslach im Kinzigtal / DE | 02 /
BURGERT, Florian Rebhalde 12 77723 Gengenbach / DE | 03 /
ALLGAIER, Volker Seilerstraße 11 77716 Haslach im Kinzigtal / DE | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/25] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19755571.7 | 13.08.2019 | [2022/25] | WO2019EP71668 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021028023 | Date: | 18.02.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4014470 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, H04B5/00, H04W84/18 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
H04L67/34 (EP);
H04L41/084 (US);
H04L67/12 (EP,US);
H04W4/38 (EP,US);
H04W4/80 (US);
H04B5/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] | Title | German: | SENSOREINRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG EINER SENSORPARAMETRIERUNG | [2022/25] | English: | SENSOR DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING A SENSOR PARAMETER SETTING | [2022/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF CAPTEUR POUR LA TRANSMISSION D'UN RÉGLAGE DE PARAMÈTRE DE CAPTEUR | [2022/25] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 24.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US7610354 (ADAMS LLOYD B [US], et al); | [A]US2010268496 (TREBBELS DENNIS [DE], et al); | [YA]DE202016103635U (SICK AG [DE]); | [A]DE102016224158 (CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) |