EP3809424 - SOLID ELECTROLYTE, ELECTRODE AND CAPACITOR ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMEC VZW Kapeldreef 75 Heverlee 3001 Leuven / BE | For all designated states Panasonic Holdings Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2022/23] |
Former [2021/16] | For all designated states IMEC VZW Kapeldreef 75 Heverlee 3001 Leuven / BE | ||
For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VEREECKEN, Philippe c/o IMEC VZW Patent Department Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | 02 /
GANDRUD, Knut Bjarne c/o IMEC VZW Patent Department Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | 03 /
MEES, Maarten c/o IMEC VZW Patent Department Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | [2021/16] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2021/16] | Application number, filing date | 19756309.1 | 12.02.2019 | [2021/16] | WO2019JP04856 | Priority number, date | JP20180112284 | 12.06.2018 Original published format: JP 2018112284 | [2021/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019239631 | Date: | 19.12.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3809424 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01B1/06, H01G9/028, H01G11/56, H01M4/13, H01M4/62, H01M10/052, H01M10/0565 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M4/13 (EP,US);
H01B1/06 (EP);
H01G11/56 (EP);
H01G9/028 (EP);
H01M10/052 (EP);
H01M10/0565 (EP);
H01M4/366 (US);
H01M4/62 (EP);
H01M4/621 (US);
H01M2004/027 (EP,US);
H01M2004/028 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0068 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0082 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0094 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/16] | Title | German: | FESTELEKTROLYT, ELEKTRODE UND KONDENSATORELEMENT | [2021/16] | English: | SOLID ELECTROLYTE, ELECTRODE AND CAPACITOR ELEMENT | [2021/16] | French: | ÉLECTROLYTE SOLIDE, ÉLECTRODE ET ÉLÉMENT CONDENSATEUR | [2021/16] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2019 | Translation filed | 24.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2019 | Examination requested [2021/16] | 18.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP2814091 (IMEC [BE]) [X] 1-7,10-15 * abstract * * claims 1-15 * * paragraphs [0004] - [0030] * [A] 8,9; | [XP]WO2018197073 (IMEC VZW [BE], et al) [XP] 1-15 * abstract * * claims 1-23 * * paragraphs [0013] - [0024] *; | [E]WO2019239631 (IMEC VZW [BE], et al) [E] 1-15* the whole document *; | [E]WO2020255467 (IMEC VZW [BE], et al) [E] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2011113906 (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC) [A] 1-21 * , entire document (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2012518248 (CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCE SCIENTIFIQUE) [A] 1-21 * , entire document & US 2012/0021279 A1, entire document & FR 2942235 A1 *; | [A]JP2015005466 (NAGOYA INST TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-21* , entire document (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2016508279 (SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD.) [A] 1-21 * , entire document & US 2015/0194701 A1, entire document & EP 2933867 A1 *; | [A]JP2017208250 (MAXELL HOLDINGS LTD) [A] 1-21 * , entire document (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2012518248 | - D. B. ASSAYS. H. KIM, "Evolution of the Adsorbed Water Layer Structure on Silicon Oxide at Room Temperature", J. Phys. Chem. B, (20050000), vol. 109, pages 16760 - 16763 |