EP3827266 - CANCER VACCINES FOR UTERINE CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CureVac Netherlands B.V. Science Park 106 3.12 1098XG Amsterdam / NL | [2022/33] |
Former [2021/22] | For all designated states Frame Pharmaceuticals B.V. Science Park 106 3.12 1098 XG Amsterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLASTERK, Ronald Hans Anton c/o Science Park 106 3.12 1098 XG Amsterdam / NL | [2021/22] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2021/22] | Application number, filing date | 19756435.4 | 25.07.2019 | [2021/22] | WO2019NL50494 | Priority number, date | NL20182021400 | 26.07.2018 Original published format: NL 2021400 | NL20192022447 | 24.01.2019 Original published format: NL 2022447 | EP20190167603 | 05.04.2019 Original published format: EP 19167603 | [2021/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020022901 | Date: | 30.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3827266 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/574, C12Q1/6886, A61K39/00 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
A61K39/0011 (EP,IL,US);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,IL,US);
G01N33/57407 (EP,IL);
A61K2039/82 (EP,IL);
A61K2039/892 (EP,IL,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/22] | Title | German: | KREBSIMPFSTOFFE GEGEN GEBÄRMUTTERKREBS | [2021/22] | English: | CANCER VACCINES FOR UTERINE CANCER | [2021/22] | French: | VACCINS CONTRE LE CANCER POUR LE CANCER DE L'UTÉRUS | [2021/22] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/22] | 01.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2021 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.08.2021 | 31.07.2024 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   22.08.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]WO2016187508 (BROAD INST INC [US], et al); | [XDI]WO2017173321 (NEON THERAPEUTICS INC [US]); | [XPI]WO2018213803 (NEON THERAPEUTICS INC [US]); | [XPI]WO2019126186 (NEON THERAPEUTICS INC [US]); | by applicant | US4722848 | WO9532731 | WO9958552 | WO2004111075 | WO2007101227 | US2010009863 | WO2011143656 | WO2013085925 | US2014170178 | EP2872533 | WO2016133927 | WO2016172722 | WO2016187508 | WO2017173321 | US2018340944 | WO2019012082 |