EP3737831 - METHOD OF WATER WELL REHABILITATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Subsurface Technologies, Inc. 40 Stone Castle Road Rock Tavern, NY 12575 / US | [2020/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANSUY, Neil 7915 Northwest 73rd Street Kansas City, MO 64152 / US | 02 /
CATANIA, Steven c/o Subsurface Technologies, Inc. 40 Stone Castle Road Rock Tavern, NY 12575 / US | 03 /
ORLANDO, Joseph 58 Tallman Avenue, 2 Nyack, NY 10960 / US | [2020/47] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/47] | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19757104.5 | 20.02.2019 | [2020/47] | WO2019US18781 | Priority number, date | US201862632856P | 20.02.2018 Original published format: US 201862632856 P | [2020/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019164956 | Date: | 29.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3737831 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E21B43/00, C09K8/52 | [2021/41] | CPC: |
E21B37/00 (EP);
E21B37/08 (US);
C09K8/52 (EP);
E21B43/164 (US);
E21B43/255 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/47] | E21B43/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SANIERUNG VON WASSERBRUNNEN | [2020/47] | English: | METHOD OF WATER WELL REHABILITATION | [2020/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉHABILITATION DE PUITS D'EAU | [2020/47] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 14.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/47] | 24.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4051908 (DRIVER W B) [X] 13-15 * claims *; | [X]US7677318 (MANSUY NEIL [US]) [X] 1,2 * claims *; | [A]CN104675374 (CHANGQING DOWNHOLE TECHNOLOGY OPERATION CO OF CNPC CHUANQING DRILLING ENG CO LTD) [A] 13-15* claims * | International search | [A]US6250388 (CARMI GENNADY [IL], et al) [A] 1-13 * ; the entire document *; | [A]US2002056550 (CATANLA STEVEN [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the entire document, and more specifically: para [0007], [0009]; title *; | [A]US2005217851 (CATANIA STEVEN [US]) [A] 1-13 * the entire document, and more specifically: para [0003], [0009], [0013], [0021], [0026]-[0027]; abstract *; | [A]US2010044102 (RINZLER CHARLES C [US], et al) [A] 1-13* ; the entire document *; | [A]US8869889 (PALMER MILES [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * ; the entire document *; | [A]US2016010442 (KEARL PETER M [US]) [A] 1-13 * ; the entire document * |