EP3756286 - HYBRID WIRELESS LINK EMPLOYING FREE-SPACE OPTICAL COMMUNICATION, RADIO FREQUENCY COMMUNICATION, AND INTELLIGENT FRAME AND PACKET SWITCHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.11.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EOS DEFENSE SYSTEMS USA, INC. 2865 Wall Triana Hwy SW Huntsville, AL 35824 / US | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STILES, William, H. c/o EOS Defense Systems USA, Inc. 2865 Wall Triana Hwy SW Huntsville, Alabama 35824 / US | 02 /
VALDEZ, Abelino, C. c/o EOS Defense Systems USA, Inc. 2865 Wall Triana Hwy SW Huntsville, Alabama 35824 / US | 03 /
WOLCOTT, Theodore, J. c/o EOS Defense Systems USA, Inc. 2865 Wall Triana Hwy SW Huntsville, Alabama 35824 / US | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/01] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19757207.6 | 21.02.2019 | [2021/01] | WO2019US19048 | Priority number, date | US201862634126P | 22.02.2018 Original published format: US 201862634126 P | US201862719561P | 17.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862719561 P | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019165146 | Date: | 29.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3756286 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/11, H04B10/27, H04B7/005, // H04L12/851, H04L12/709, H04L12/701, H04W28/02, H04B10/112, H04W24/08, H04W48/18 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
H04W48/18 (EP,US);
H04B10/11 (US);
H04B10/1123 (EP);
H04B10/271 (US);
H04L47/2441 (EP);
H04W72/54 (US);
H04L45/245 (EP);
H04L47/2408 (EP);
H04W24/08 (EP,US);
H04W28/0231 (EP);
H04W28/0236 (EP);
H04W28/0263 (EP);
H04W28/0268 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/01] | H04B10/11, H04B10/27, H04B7/005 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Title | German: | OPTISCHE FREIRAUMKOMMUNIKATION MIT VERWENDUNG VON HYBRIDER DRAHTLOSER VERBINDUNG, HOCHFREQUENZKOMMUNIKATION UND INTELLIGENTE RAHMEN- UND PAKETVERMITTLUNG | [2021/01] | English: | HYBRID WIRELESS LINK EMPLOYING FREE-SPACE OPTICAL COMMUNICATION, RADIO FREQUENCY COMMUNICATION, AND INTELLIGENT FRAME AND PACKET SWITCHING | [2021/01] | French: | LIAISON SANS FIL HYBRIDE UTILISANT UNE COMMUNICATION OPTIQUE EN ESPACE LIBRE, UNE COMMUNICATION RADIOFRÉQUENCE ET UNE COMMUTATION INTELLIGENTE DE TRAME ET DE PAQUET | [2021/01] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 28.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/53] | 27.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006227794 (SHIVNAN AINE [US]); | [XI]US7453835 (COTY CONSTANCE JEAN [US], et al); | [XI]US2009175285 (WOOD STEVEN [US], et al); | [XI]US2010214974 (ELLIOTT BRIG BARNUM [US]); | [A]US2012308235 (PUSARLA CHANDRASEKHAR [US], et al); | [A]EP3284287 (NOKIA SOLUTIONS & NETWORKS OY [FI]) | International search | [Y]US2002089726 (HE ZHAN [US], et al); | [Y]US6516192 (SPAUR CHARLES W [US], et al); | [Y]US6834836 (HEYWOOD TIMOTHY CHARLES [US]); | [YA]US2006227794 (SHIVNAN AINE [US]); | [Y]US7165102 (SHAH TUSHAR RAMANLAL [US], et al); | [Y]US7372876 (ABEL URICH [DE], et al); | [Y]US2009040930 (YONGE III LAWRENCE W [US], et al); | [Y]US8401906 (RUCKART JOHN [US]); | [A]US8971720 (SAINT GEORGES ERIC [US], et al); | [Y]US2016095121 (NEGUS KEVIN J [US], et al); | [Y]WO2016112289 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]); | [Y]WO2016190961 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]) | by applicant | US2006227794 | US7453835 | US2009175285 | US2010214974 | US2012308235 | EP3284287 |