EP3844493 - A CONNECTION DEVICE FOR A SEPARATION SYSTEM SUCH AS A CHROMATOGRAPHY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cytiva Sweden AB Björkgatan 30 751 84 Uppsala / SE | [2021/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEBAUER, Klaus GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB Bjorkgatan 30 751 84 Uppsala / SE | 02 /
LUNDIN, Andreas GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB Bjorkgatan 30 751 84 Uppsala / SE | 03 /
LUNDSTRÖM, Fredrik GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB Bjorkgatan 30 751 84 Uppsala / SE | [2021/27] | Representative(s) | Bedford, Grant Richard Global Life Sciences Solutions Operations UK Ltd Amersham Place Little Chalfont, Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | [2021/27] | Application number, filing date | 19758382.6 | 20.08.2019 | [2021/27] | WO2019EP72307 | Priority number, date | GB20180014213 | 31.08.2018 Original published format: GB 201814213 | [2021/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020043557 | Date: | 05.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3844493 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3844493 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01N30/20, G01N30/38, G01N30/46, // B01D15/10, B01D15/18 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
G01N30/20 (EP,US);
B01D15/18 (EP,US);
G01N30/38 (EP,US);
G01N30/468 (EP,US);
B01D15/10 (EP);
G01N2030/205 (US)
|
Former IPC [2021/27] | G01N30/46, G01N30/20, G01N30/38, B01D15/10, B01D15/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN TRENNSYSTEM, Z.B. EIN CHROMATOGRAPHIE-SYSTEM | [2023/25] | English: | A CONNECTION DEVICE FOR A SEPARATION SYSTEM SUCH AS A CHROMATOGRAPHY SYSTEM | [2021/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RACCORDEMENT POUR UN SYSTÈME DE SÉPARATION, PAR EXEMPLE UN SYSTÈME DE CHROMATOGRAPHIE | [2023/25] |
Former [2021/27] | ANSCHLUSSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN TRENNSYSTEM WIE EIN CHROMATOGRAFIESYSTEM | ||
Former [2021/27] | DISPOSITIF DE RACCORDEMENT POUR UN SYSTÈME DE SÉPARATION TEL QU'UN SYSTÈME DE CHROMATOGRAPHIE | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 10.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.10.2023 | CZ | 11.10.2023 | DK | 11.10.2023 | EE | 11.10.2023 | ES | 11.10.2023 | HR | 11.10.2023 | IT | 11.10.2023 | LT | 11.10.2023 | LV | 11.10.2023 | NL | 11.10.2023 | PL | 11.10.2023 | RO | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SE | 11.10.2023 | SK | 11.10.2023 | SM | 11.10.2023 | BG | 11.01.2024 | NO | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | PT | 12.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
CZ | 11.10.2023 | ||
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 11.10.2023 | |
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 11.10.2023 | |
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 11.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO03026772 (PURDUE RESEARCH FOUNDATION [US], et al) [A] 1-23* claims 1,5,6 *; | [IY] - CHIM YONG CHIN ET AL, "Simulated Moving Bed Equipment Designs", SEPARATION AND PURIFICATION REVIEWS, US, (20040112), vol. 33, no. 2, doi:10.1081/SPM-200042081, ISSN 1542-2119, pages 77 - 155, XP055263428 [I] 1 * figures 8a-8c * * page 120, line 39 - page 121, line 4; figure 24 * * page 115, paragraph 1 * * page 126, lines 3-5 * * page 84, lines 4-7 * * page 105 * [Y] 1-23 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1081/SPM-200042081 | [Y] - RUI P.V. FARIA ET AL, "Instrumental aspects of Simulated Moving Bed chromatography", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY A, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20150828), vol. 1421, doi:10.1016/j.chroma.2015.08.045, ISSN 0021-9673, pages 82 - 102, XP055263441 [Y] 1-23 * page 90, column l, lines 4-6 * * page 91, column l, lines 5-11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chroma.2015.08.045 |