EP3830814 - PSEUDO-RANDOM PERMUTATION GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique et aux Energies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2021/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENJILALI, Wissam c/o CEA GRENOBLE 17 rue des Martyrs 38054 GRENOBLE CEDEX 9 / FR | 02 /
GUICQUERO, William c/o CEA GRENOBLE 17 rue des Martyrs 38054 GRENOBLE CEDEX 9 / FR | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beaumont 4, Place Robert Schuman B.P. 1529 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | [2021/23] | Application number, filing date | 19758624.1 | 31.07.2019 | [2021/23] | WO2019EP70569 | Priority number, date | FR20180057308 | 03.08.2018 Original published format: FR 1857308 | FR20180057958 | 05.09.2018 Original published format: FR 1857958 | [2021/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020025649 | Date: | 06.02.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3830814 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3830814 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G09C1/00, G06F7/76 | [2021/23] | CPC: |
G09C1/00 (EP);
G06F7/582 (EP,US);
G06F21/602 (EP);
G06F21/72 (EP);
H03K3/84 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PSEUDOZUFALLSMUTATIONSGENERATOR | [2021/23] | English: | PSEUDO-RANDOM PERMUTATION GENERATOR | [2021/23] | French: | GÉNÉRATEUR D'UNE PERMUTATION PSEUDO-ALÉATOIRE | [2021/23] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 29.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.07.2019 | AL | 27.07.2022 | AT | 27.07.2022 | CY | 27.07.2022 | CZ | 27.07.2022 | DK | 27.07.2022 | EE | 27.07.2022 | ES | 27.07.2022 | FI | 27.07.2022 | HR | 27.07.2022 | IT | 27.07.2022 | LT | 27.07.2022 | LV | 27.07.2022 | MC | 27.07.2022 | MK | 27.07.2022 | NL | 27.07.2022 | PL | 27.07.2022 | RO | 27.07.2022 | RS | 27.07.2022 | SE | 27.07.2022 | SI | 27.07.2022 | SK | 27.07.2022 | SM | 27.07.2022 | TR | 27.07.2022 | BE | 31.07.2022 | CH | 31.07.2022 | IE | 31.07.2022 | LI | 31.07.2022 | LU | 31.07.2022 | NO | 27.10.2022 | GR | 28.10.2022 | IS | 27.11.2022 | PT | 28.11.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/26] | HU | 31.07.2019 | |
AL | 27.07.2022 | ||
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CY | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
IT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
MK | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SI | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
IE | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
LU | 31.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/25] | HU | 31.07.2019 | |
AL | 27.07.2022 | ||
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CY | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
MK | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SI | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
IE | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
LU | 31.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CY | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
MK | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SI | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
IE | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
LU | 31.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CY | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SI | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
IE | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
LU | 31.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SI | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
IE | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
LU | 31.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
IE | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
LU | 31.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
LU | 31.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 27.07.2022 | |
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
LU | 31.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 27.07.2022 | |
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
LU | 31.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 27.07.2022 | |
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
LU | 31.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 27.07.2022 | |
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
LU | 31.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 27.07.2022 | |
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 27.07.2022 | |
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 27.07.2022 | |
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 27.07.2022 | |
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 27.07.2022 | |
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 27.07.2022 | |
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | NL | 27.07.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2006120619 (AVIDAN SHMUEL [US], et al); |