EP3841054 - CRANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.07.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liebherr-Werk Biberach GmbH Memminger Str. 120 88400 Biberach an der Riss / DE | [2021/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAUPATZ, Matthias Reutele 14 88400 Biberach-Ringschnait / DE | [2021/26] | Representative(s) | Thoma, Michael Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2021/26] | Application number, filing date | 19758698.5 | 22.08.2019 | [2021/26] | WO2019EP72417 | Priority number, date | DE201810122349 | 13.09.2018 Original published format: DE102018122349 | [2021/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020052931 | Date: | 19.03.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3841054 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B66C23/16, B66C23/26, B66C23/64 | [2021/26] | CPC: |
B66C23/16 (EP,US);
B66C23/64 (EP,US);
B66C23/022 (US);
B66C23/26 (EP);
B66C23/72 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/26] | Title | German: | KRAN | [2021/26] | English: | CRANE | [2021/26] | French: | GRUE | [2021/26] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/26] | 25.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]SU1082749 (TS K B STROJMASH N PROIZV OBED [SU]); | [A]CN2261415Y (CHANGSHA CONSTRUCTION MACHINES [CN]); | [A]CN203820334U (INST BUILDING MECHANIZATION CHINA ACADEMY BUILDING RES, et al) | by applicant | GB1493715 | ES2264334 | DE102005018522 | EP2041017 |