EP3827578 - MANAGING OPERATIONS ASSOCIATED WITH AN OBJECT ON IOT ENABLED DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/22] | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MANAGING OPERATION ASSOCIATED WITH AN OBJECT ON IOT ENABLED DEVICES | ||
[2023/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2021/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANARDHANAN, Shaiju TP house, Aduthila (PO) Payangadi Kannur, Kerala 67030 / IN | 02 /
KRISHNAN, Sandeep AJMERA STONE PARK 1st CROSS, NEELADRI NAGAR, ELECTRONIC CITY PH 1, K-301 Bangalore, Karnataka 560100 / IN | [2021/22] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2023/28] |
Former [2021/22] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19759005.2 | 30.08.2019 | [2021/22] | WO2019EP73254 | Priority number, date | EP20180191989 | 31.08.2018 Original published format: EP 18191989 | [2021/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020043897 | Date: | 05.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3827578 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3827578 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L67/12, H04L67/06, H04L67/62, G06F8/65 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
H04L67/12 (EP,US);
H04L43/08 (US);
G06F8/65 (EP,US);
G16Y30/00 (US);
G16Y40/10 (US);
G16Y40/35 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/22] | H04L29/08, G06F8/65 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWALTUNG VON OPERATIONEN IN ZUSAMMENHANG MIT EINEM OBJEKT AUF IOT-FÄHIGEN VORRICHTUNGEN | [2023/10] | English: | MANAGING OPERATIONS ASSOCIATED WITH AN OBJECT ON IOT ENABLED DEVICES | [2023/10] | French: | GESTION DES OPÉRATIONS ASSOCIÉES À UN OBJET SUR DES DISPOSITIFS IOT | [2023/10] |
Former [2021/22] | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VERWALTUNG VON OPERATIONEN IN ZUSAMMENHANG MIT EINEM OBJEKT AUF IOT-KOMPATIBLEN VORRICHTUNGEN | ||
Former [2021/22] | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MANAGING OPERATION ASSOCIATED WITH AN OBJECT ON IOT ENABLED DEVICES | ||
Former [2021/22] | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE FONCTIONNEMENT ASSOCIÉ À UN OBJET SUR DES DISPOSITIFS COMPATIBLES IOT | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/22] | 24.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.07.2023 | CZ | 12.07.2023 | DK | 12.07.2023 | EE | 12.07.2023 | ES | 12.07.2023 | FI | 12.07.2023 | HR | 12.07.2023 | LT | 12.07.2023 | LV | 12.07.2023 | MC | 12.07.2023 | NL | 12.07.2023 | PL | 12.07.2023 | RO | 12.07.2023 | RS | 12.07.2023 | SE | 12.07.2023 | SI | 12.07.2023 | SK | 12.07.2023 | SM | 12.07.2023 | IE | 30.08.2023 | LU | 30.08.2023 | BE | 31.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | FR | 12.09.2023 | GB | 12.10.2023 | NO | 12.10.2023 | GR | 13.10.2023 | IS | 12.11.2023 | PT | 13.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
IE | 30.08.2023 | ||
LU | 30.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
FR | 12.09.2023 | ||
GB | 12.10.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
IE | 30.08.2023 | ||
LU | 30.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
GB | 12.10.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
LU | 30.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
LU | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
LU | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 12.07.2023 | |
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 12.07.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2012324578 (SEINFELD MARC [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0043] , [0 46] *; | [A]US2018157557 (PUUSTINEN ISMO [FI], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0021] - [0026] * * paragraphs [0034] - [0037]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0047] , [0 48]; figure 3 *; | [A]US2018189048 (BALA KARTHIK [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0073] , [0 74]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0118] - paragraph [0122]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0109]; figure 3 * | by applicant | US2018157557 | US2018189048 |