EP3823599 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS WITH A CDC7 INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-Shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP | [2021/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAO, Yijie c/o Millennium Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 40 Landsdowne Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | [2024/35] |
Former [2021/21] | 01 /
GAO, Yijie c/o Millennium Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 40 Landsdowne Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | Representative(s) | Harris, Jennifer Lucy, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2021/21] | Application number, filing date | 19759061.5 | 18.07.2019 | [2021/21] | WO2019JP29113 | Priority number, date | US201862700384P | 19.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862700384 P | [2021/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020017666 | Date: | 23.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3823599 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3823599 | Date: | 28.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20, A61K31/519 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
A61K9/2054 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/2018 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/2027 (EP,IL,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2021/21] | A61K9/20, A61K31/4985 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT EINEM CDC7-INHIBITOR | [2021/21] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS WITH A CDC7 INHIBITOR | [2021/21] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES COMPRENANT UN INHIBITEUR DE CDC7 | [2021/21] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 03.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDYI]US8722660 (HOMMA MISAKI [JP], et al); | [YD]WO2017172565 (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS CO [US]) | by applicant | WO2011102399 | US8722660 | US8921354 | US8933069 | US2015158882 | WO2017172565 |