EP3850240 - BRAKE CALIPER OF A DISK BRAKE, AND DISK BRAKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Str. 80 80809 München / DE | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FISCHL, Tobias Kobellstr. 2b 80336 München / DE | 02 /
PRITZ, Wolfgang Waisenhausstr. 55 80637 München / DE | [2021/29] | Application number, filing date | 19759357.7 | 26.08.2019 | [2021/29] | WO2019EP72726 | Priority number, date | DE201810122008 | 10.09.2018 Original published format: DE102018122008 | [2021/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020052954 | Date: | 19.03.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3850240 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3850240 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/00 | [2021/29] | CPC: |
F16D65/0068 (EP,US);
F16D55/2255 (US);
F16D2055/0016 (EP,US);
F16D2125/28 (EP);
F16D2125/32 (EP);
F16D2125/64 (EP,US);
F16D55/226 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BREMSSATTEL EINER SCHEIBENBREMSE UND SCHEIBENBREMSE | [2021/29] | English: | BRAKE CALIPER OF A DISK BRAKE, AND DISK BRAKE | [2021/29] | French: | ÉTRIER D'UN FREIN À DISQUE ET FREIN À DISQUE | [2021/29] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 12.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 12.10.2022 | EE | 12.10.2022 | HR | 12.10.2022 | LT | 12.10.2022 | LV | 12.10.2022 | MC | 12.10.2022 | RS | 12.10.2022 | SI | 12.10.2022 | SM | 12.10.2022 | NO | 12.01.2023 | IS | 12.02.2023 | [2024/16] |
Former [2023/51] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SI | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 12.10.2022 | |
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HR | 12.10.2022 | |
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | HR | 12.10.2022 | |
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | LT | 12.10.2022 | |
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 12.10.2022 | |
NO | 12.01.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE102011103963 (WABCO RADBREMSEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 * figure 2 *; | [Y]DE202014010485U (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME FUER NUTZFAHRZEUGE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 3* paragraph [0076]; figure 4 *; | [XY]DE102016115176 (BPW BERGISCHE ACHSEN KG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 3; | [X]DE102016120478 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME FUER NUTZFAHRZEUGE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 * figure 1 * |