EP3811029 - METHOD FOR VEHICLE ENVIRONMENT MAPPING, CORRESPONDING SYSTEM, VEHICLE AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marelli Europe S.p.A. Viale Aldo Borletti 61/63 20011 Corbetta (MI) / IT | [2021/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIORGIO, Giuseppe c/o Magneti Marelli S.p.A. Viale Aldo Borletti 61/63 20011 Corbetta (Milano) / IT | 02 /
FURLAN, Axel c/o Magneti Marelli S.p.A. Viale Aldo Borletti 61/63 20011 Corbetta (Milano) / IT | 03 /
SNIDARO, Lauro c/o Università degli Studi di Udine Via Palladio 8 33100 Udine / IT | 04 /
VACI, Lubos 20 Dixon Road Hillsborough S6 4FZ, Sheffield / GB | [2021/41] |
Former [2021/17] | 01 /
GIORGIO, Giuseppe c/o Magneti Marelli S.p.A. Viale Aldo Borletti 61/63 20011 Corbetta (Milano) / IT | ||
02 /
FURLAN, Axel c/o Magneti Marelli S.p.A. Viale Aldo Borletti 61/63 20011 Corbetta (Milano) / IT | |||
03 /
SNIDARO, Lauro c/o Università degli Studi di Udine Via Palladio 8 33100 Udine / IT | |||
04 /
VACI, Lubos 20 Dixon Road Hillsborough, S6 4FZ, Sheffield / GB | Representative(s) | Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2023/41] | Notaro, Giancarlo Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2021/17] | Notaro, Giancarlo Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 19759733.9 | 19.06.2019 | [2021/17] | WO2019IB55145 | Priority number, date | IT20180006594 | 22.06.2018 Original published format: IT201800006594 | [2021/17] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019244060 | Date: | 26.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3811029 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3811029 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/00 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
G01C21/3407 (EP,US);
G01C21/3848 (EP,US);
G01C21/3881 (EP,US);
G01S17/86 (EP,US);
G01S17/89 (EP,US);
G01S17/931 (EP,US);
G05D1/0214 (US);
G05D1/617 (US);
G06F18/251 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/17] | G01C21/32, G01C21/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ABBILDUNG EINER FAHRZEUGUMGEBUNG, ENTSPRECHENDES SYSTEM, FAHRZEUG UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT | [2021/17] | English: | METHOD FOR VEHICLE ENVIRONMENT MAPPING, CORRESPONDING SYSTEM, VEHICLE AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT | [2021/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CARTOGRAPHIE DE L'ENVIRONNEMENT D'UN VÉHICULE, AINSI QUE SYSTÈME, VÉHICULE ET PROGRAMME-PRODUIT D'ORDINATEUR CORRESPONDANTS | [2021/17] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 11.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.10.2023 | CZ | 11.10.2023 | DK | 11.10.2023 | EE | 11.10.2023 | ES | 11.10.2023 | HR | 11.10.2023 | LT | 11.10.2023 | LV | 11.10.2023 | NL | 11.10.2023 | PL | 11.10.2023 | RO | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SE | 11.10.2023 | SK | 11.10.2023 | SM | 11.10.2023 | BG | 11.01.2024 | NO | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | PT | 12.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
CZ | 11.10.2023 | ||
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 11.10.2023 | |
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 11.10.2023 | |
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 11.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X] - SEEGER CHRISTOPH ET AL, "Locally adaptive discounting in multi sensor occupancy grid fusion", 2016 IEEE INTELLIGENT VEHICLES SYMPOSIUM (IV), IEEE, (20160619), doi:10.1109/IVS.2016.7535396, pages 266 - 271, XP032938974 [X] 1-3,10,12-17 * abstract * * figures 2,3,7 * * table 1 * * sections I, IV, V * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IVS.2016.7535396 | [X] - J. D ADARVE ET AL, "Computing occupancy grids from multiple sensors using linear opinion pools", 2013 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION (ICRA); 6-10 MAY 2013; KARLSRUHE, GERMANY, US, (20120501), doi:10.1109/ICRA.2012.6224976, ISSN 1050-4729, ISBN 978-1-4673-5641-1, pages 4074 - 4079, XP055554905 [X] 1-3,14,17 * abstract * * Sections I, IV * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICRA.2012.6224976 | [X] - J MORAS ET AL, "Credibilist occupancy grids for vehicle perception in dynamic environments", 2013 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION (ICRA); 6-10 MAY 2013; KARLSRUHE, GERMANY, US, (20110501), doi:10.1109/ICRA.2011.5980298, ISSN 1050-4729, ISBN 978-1-4673-5641-1, pages 84 - 89, XP055555259 [X] 1-4,14,17 * Sections II, IV * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICRA.2011.5980298 | [X] - KAUSTUBH PATHAK ET AL, "3D forward sensor modeling and application to occupancy grid based sensor fusion", 2013 IEEE/RSJ INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTELLIGENT ROBOTS AND SYSTEMS, (20071001), doi:10.1109/IROS.2007.4399406, ISSN 2153-0858, pages 2059 - 2064, XP055555272 [X] 1,14,17 * abstract * * Section III * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IROS.2007.4399406 | [X] - Carlos Gálvez Del Postigo Fernández ET AL, "Grid-Based Multi-Sensor Fusion for On-Road Obstacle Detection: Application to Autonomous Driving", (20150101), URL: https://www.diva-portal.org/smash/get/diva2:852457/FULLTEXT01.pdf, (20190211), XP055555247 [X] 1,5-7,9,11,14,17 * Chapter 6 * | [X] - Jean Dezert ET AL, "Environment Perception Using Grid Occupancy Estimation With Belief Functions", doi:10.5281/zenodo.34808, (20150701), URL: https://www.onera.fr/sites/default/files/297/C109.pdf, (20190212), XP055555469 [X] 1,8,14,17 * abstract * * Section II * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5281/zenodo.34808 |