EP3759957 - DEVICE PAIRING SYSTEM AND METHOD, AND DEVICE COMMUNICATION CONTROL SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-1-2, Shimohozumi Ibaraki Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PUPAKDEE, Karn c/o Zensorium (Thailand) Ltd No. 2525, FYI Center 5th Floor, Unit 1/507-508 Rama 4 Road, Klongtoei Klongtoei, Bangkok, 10110 / TH | 02 /
SRISURIYASAVAD, Adisak c/o Zensorium (Thailand) Ltd No. 2525, FYI Center 5th Floor, Unit 1/507-508 Rama 4 Road, Klongtoei Klongtoei, Bangkok, 10110 / TH | 03 /
PLALAKAWONG, Jugkree Na Ayutthaya c/o Zensorium (Thailand) Ltd No. 2525, FYI Center 5th Floor, Unit 1/507-508 Rama 4 Road, Klongtoei Klongtoei, Bangkok, 10110 / TH | 04 /
BOONPREM, Suwan c/o Zensorium (Thailand) Ltd No. 2525, FYI Center 5th Floor, Unit 1/507-508 Rama 4 Road, Klongtoei Klongtoei, Bangkok, 10110 / TH | 05 /
CHUWATSAWAT, Suppasit c/o Zensorium (Thailand) Ltd No. 2525, FYI Center 5th Floor, Unit 1/507-508 Rama 4 Road, Klongtoei Klongtoei, Bangkok, 10110 / TH | 06 /
TREPETCH, Shoko c/o Zensorium (Thailand) Ltd No. 2525, FYI Center 5th Floor, Unit 1/507-508 Rama 4 Road, Klongtoei Klongtoei, Bangkok, 10110 / TH | 07 /
PHILLIPS, Austin c/o Planet Innovation Pty Ltd Ground Floor, 436 Elgar Road, Box Hill Melbourne, Victoria 3128 / AU | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/01] | Bradley, Susan Jane Marks & Clerk LLP Fletcher House The Oxford Science Park Heatley Road Oxford OX4 4GE / GB | Application number, filing date | 19760012.5 | 28.02.2019 | [2021/01] | WO2019SG50113 | Priority number, date | SG20181001797Q | 02.03.2018 Original published format: SG10201801797Q | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019168476 | Date: | 06.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3759957 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SG | 06.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/50, H04W12/37, H04W12/06, H04L9/32, G06F21/30, H04L9/08, // H04W76/11, H04W76/14, H04W84/18, H04L29/06, G06F21/44 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
G06F21/445 (EP,KR);
H04W12/50 (EP,KR);
H04W76/11 (EP,US);
H04L63/0869 (EP,KR);
H04L9/3242 (EP,KR);
H04L9/3271 (EP,KR);
H04W12/06 (EP,KR);
H04W12/69 (KR);
H04W4/80 (KR);
H04W48/16 (US);
H04W64/00 (US);
H04L2209/80 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/01] | H04W12/00, H04L9/32, H04W76/14, G06F21/30, H04L9/08, H04W76/11 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR GERÄTEPAARUNG SOWIE SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR GERÄTEKOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERUNG | [2021/01] | English: | DEVICE PAIRING SYSTEM AND METHOD, AND DEVICE COMMUNICATION CONTROL SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2021/01] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'APPARIEMENT DE DISPOSITIFS, ET SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATION DE DISPOSITIF | [2021/01] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SG | 04.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 25.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2852122 (NETFLIX INC [US]) [I] 1,2,5,6,8,11,13-15 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0067] * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2017013104 (IINUMA NOBUHARU [JP]) [A] 15 * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0133] * * page 6 *; | [A]US2017013342 (WATSON ROBERT D [US], et al) [A] 15* paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0048]; figures 1A-5B *; | [I]US9848075 (AHMAD SALMAN [US], et al) [I] 1,2,5,6,8,11,13-15 * column 5, line 53 - column 25, line 17 * * figures 1A-7 * | International search | [X]US8422428 (HILYARD TREY A [US], et al) [X] 35, 36 * column 4, lines 23-48; column 8, line 26-40; column 10, line 49-column 11, line 13; figures 1, 3 *; | [XY]US2015180671 (YAMASHITA SUSUMU [JP]) [X] 30, 32 * paragraphs [0035], [0036]; figure 1 * [Y] 5-9, 20-24; | [A]US2016339176 (SHAPLEY JULIAN [GB], et al) [A] - * whole document especially paragraph [0056]; figure 7 *; | [A]CN106230587 (INSPUR SOFTWARE CO LTD) [A] -* whole document of the original non-English language document (a machine translation is enclosed only for your reference) *; | [XY]US9848075 (AHMAD SALMAN [US], et al) [X] 1-4, 10-19, 25-29, 31, 33-36 * column 9, line 48-column 10, line 7; column 11, lines 1-10; column 17, lines 47-51; column 18, line 44-53; column 23, line 64-column 24, line 14; column 25, lines 1-9; figures 1A, 2A, 6B * [Y] 5-9, 20-24 | by applicant | EP2852122 | US9848075 |