EP3760613 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING MERCAPTOPHENOL COMPOUND AND INTERMEDIATE OF SAID COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kumiai Chemical Industry Co., Ltd. 4-26, Ikenohata 1 chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0008 / JP | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAMBAI Kazuhiro c/o KUMIAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 4-26, Ikenohata 1-chome, Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0008 / JP | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstraße 2 80538 München / DE | [2023/04] |
Former [2021/01] | Keller, Günter, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19760088.5 | 22.02.2019 | [2021/01] | WO2019JP06674 | Priority number, date | JP20180033523 | 27.02.2018 Original published format: JP 2018033523 | [2021/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019167814 | Date: | 06.09.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3760613 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3760613 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07C271/44, C07C319/06, C07C319/12, C07C319/24, C07C321/28, C07C269/00, C07C319/22, C07C323/20 | [2022/17] | CPC: |
C07C323/20 (EP,CN,KR);
C07C271/44 (CN,KR);
C07C319/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07C269/00 (EP,CN,KR);
C07C319/12 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07C319/22 (EP,KR);
| C-Set: |
C07C269/00, C07C271/44 (EP,CN);
C07C319/06, C07C323/20 (CN,EP);
C07C319/12, C07C323/20 (CN,EP);
C07C319/22, C07C323/20 (EP); |
Former IPC [2021/01] | C07C321/26, C07C271/44, C07C319/06, C07C319/12, C07C319/24, C07C321/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MERCAPTOPHENOLVERBINDUNG UND ZWISCHENPRODUKT DER BESAGTEN VERBINDUNG | [2021/01] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING MERCAPTOPHENOL COMPOUND AND INTERMEDIATE OF SAID COMPOUND | [2021/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN COMPOSÉ MERCAPTO-PHÉNOL ET D'UN INTERMÉDIAIRE DUDIT COMPOSÉ | [2021/01] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2020 | Translation filed | 17.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 17.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 18.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.01.2023 | CZ | 25.01.2023 | DK | 25.01.2023 | EE | 25.01.2023 | ES | 25.01.2023 | FI | 25.01.2023 | HR | 25.01.2023 | IT | 25.01.2023 | LT | 25.01.2023 | LV | 25.01.2023 | MC | 25.01.2023 | NL | 25.01.2023 | PL | 25.01.2023 | RO | 25.01.2023 | RS | 25.01.2023 | SE | 25.01.2023 | SI | 25.01.2023 | SK | 25.01.2023 | SM | 25.01.2023 | IE | 22.02.2023 | LU | 22.02.2023 | BE | 28.02.2023 | CH | 28.02.2023 | LI | 28.02.2023 | FR | 25.03.2023 | GB | 25.04.2023 | NO | 25.04.2023 | GR | 26.04.2023 | IS | 25.05.2023 | PT | 25.05.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/11] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
MC | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SI | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
IE | 22.02.2023 | ||
LU | 22.02.2023 | ||
BE | 28.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
FR | 25.03.2023 | ||
GB | 25.04.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
MC | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
IE | 22.02.2023 | ||
LU | 22.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
GB | 25.04.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
MC | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
LU | 22.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
MC | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
LU | 22.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
MC | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 25.01.2023 | |
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 25.01.2023 | |
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 25.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2015025826 (HOKKO CHEM IND CO [JP]) [AD] 1-16* page 123, paragraph 0231 *; | [A]EP3162799 (IHARA CHEMICAL IND CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * reference example 7; page 151 * * reference example 3; page 148 * | International search | [X]DE961042 (BOEHRINGER SOHN INGELHEIM) [X] 5-6 1-4, 7-18 * , page 2, left column, claims (Family: none) *; | [XA]DE1139113 (BASF AG) [X] 5 * , examples, claims (Family: none) * [A] 1-4, 6-18; | [XA]DE2119518 (FARBENFABRIKEN BAYER AG) [X] 5 * , examples, claims & GB 1350528 A (examples) & FR 2136602 A & CH 566971 A & SU 443510 A & NL 7205271 A * [A] 1-4, 6-18; | [XA]EP0006990 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 5 * , examples, claims & DE 2826012 A1 * [A] 1-4, 6-18; | [A]JP2002260730 (SONY CORP, et al) [A] 5-6 1-4, 7-18 * , claims, paragraph [0013], examples, etc. (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2015122396 (IHARA CHEMICAL IND CO [JP]) [A] 1-18 * , examples, claims & CN 105980354 A & TW 201613856 A *; | [A]JP2016084346 (HOKKO CHEM IND CO) [A] 1-18 * , claims, examples (Family: none) *; | [A]CN107286057 (INST PHARMACOLOGY & TOXICOLOGY ACADEMY MILITARY MEDICAL SCIENCES PLA CHINA) [A] 1-18* , claims, examples (Family: none) *; | [XA] - SUN, X. et al., "Room-temperature Pd-catalyzed C-H chlorination by weak coordination: one-pot synthesis of 2-chlorophenols with excellent regioselectivity", Chemical Communications, (20140000), vol. 50, no. 10, doi:10.1039/C3CC47431C, ISSN 1359-7345, pages 1262 - 1264, XP055634798 [X] 5-6 [A] 1-4, 7-18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C3CC47431C | [XA] - CAS, (19841116), Database accession no. 36552-39-3, URL: STN [X] 5-6 [A] 1-4, 7-18 | [XA] - CAS, (19841116), Database accession no. 36552-40-6, URL: STN [X] 5-6 [A] 1-4, 7-18 | [XA] - SUN, X. et al., "Pd(II) catalyzed ortho C-H iodination of phenylcarbamates at room temperature using cyclic hypervalent iodine reagents", Chemical Communications, (20150000), vol. 51, no. 49, doi:10.1039/C5CC02533H, ISSN 1359-7345, pages 10014 - 10017, XP055634801 [X] 5 [A] 1-4, 6-18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C5CC02533H | [XA] - JOHN, A. et al., "Palladium Catalyzed C-H Functionalization of 0-Arylcarbamates: Selective ortho-Bromination Using NBS", The Journal of Organic Chemistry, (20120000), vol. 77, no. 13, doi:10.1021/jo300713h, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 5600 - 5605, XP055428085 [X] 5 [A] 1-4, 6-18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo300713h | [XA] - CAS, (19841116), Database accession no. 36552-41-7, URL: STN [X] 5 [A] 1-4, 6-18 | [XA] - CAS, (19841116), Database accession no. 36552-43-9, URL: STN [X] 5 [A] 1-4, 6-18 | by applicant | WO2013111864 | WO2013157229 | WO2015025826 | WO2015122396 | - WESSELY, F.SILHAN, W.POLANSKY, 0. E., "Preparation of m-hydroxyphenylsulfonic acids and m-hydroxythiophenol", Monatshefte fuer Chemie, (19680000), vol. 99, pages 2048 - 2058 | - WESSELY, F.SWOBODA, J.SCHMIDT, G., "Action of thiols and sulfinic acids on quinol acetates. II", Monatshefte fuer Chemie, (19600000), vol. 91, pages 57 - 78 | - Shin Jikkenkagaku Koza (New Experimental Chemistry Course) 9 Bunsekikagaku (Analytical Chemistry) II, Shingo Iizumi, Maruzen Co., Ltd, (19770000), pages 86 - 112 | - Jikkenkagaku Koza (Experimental Chemistry Course) 20-1 Bunsekikagaku (Analytical Chemistry, Seishiro Murata, Maruzen Co., Ltd, (20070000), pages 130 - 151 | - Jikkenkagaku Koza (Experimental Chemistry Course) 4 Netsu, Atsuryoku (Heat and Pressure, Kumao Ebihara, Maruzen Co., Ltd, (19920000), pages 57 - 93 | - Jikkenkagaku Koza (Experimental Chemistry Course) 6 Ondo-Netsu, Atsuryoku (Temperature and Heat and Pressure, Seishiro Murata, Maruzen Co., Ltd, (20050000), pages 203 - 205 |