EP3759894 - LIGHTWEIGHT SECURE AUTONOMIC CONTROL PLANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.01.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ECKERT, Toerless 777 W. Middlefield Road Apt. 79 Mountain View, CA 94034 / US | 02 /
JIANG, Sheng Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Bing Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2021/01] | Application number, filing date | 19760166.9 | 26.02.2019 | [2021/01] | WO2019CN76131 | Priority number, date | US201815910947 | 02.03.2018 Original published format: US201815910947 | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019165950 | Date: | 06.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3759894 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3759894 | Date: | 24.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/40 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
H04L63/0471 (EP);
H04L63/0428 (EP,US);
H04L63/1416 (EP);
H04L63/1441 (US);
H04L63/1466 (EP);
H04L63/166 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/01] | H04L29/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEICHTE SICHERE AUTONOME KONTROLLEBENE | [2021/01] | English: | LIGHTWEIGHT SECURE AUTONOMIC CONTROL PLANE | [2021/01] | French: | PLAN DE COMMANDE AUTONOME SÉCURISÉ LÉGER | [2021/01] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 01.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 06.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2014192808 (THUBERT PASCAL [US], et al); | [A]WO2017011948 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]WO2017066574 (CONVIDA WIRELESS LLC [US]); | International search | [A]WO2017011948 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]WO2017066574 (CONVIDA WIRELESS LLC [US]) | by applicant | US2014192808 | WO2017011948 | WO2017066574 |