EP3760553 - DEVICE FOR AUTOMATICALLY OPENING CONTAINERS INCLUDING MEANS FOR BREAKING THE SEALING ELEMENT OF THE CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Martins, Andrea Luciana Rua da Assembleia N° 38 -6° Andar - Centro 20011000 Rio de Janeiro / BR | For all designated states Da Costa, Ivan Ferreira Rua da Assembleia N° 38 -6° Andar - Centro 20011000 Rio de Janeiro / BR | For all designated states Avila, Mario Luiz Novaes Rua da Assembleia N° 38 -6° Andar - Centro 20011000 Rio de Janeiro / BR | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DA COSTA, Ivan Ferreira Rua da Assembléia n° 38 - 6° andar Centro CEP: 20011-000 Rio de Janeiro - RJ / BR | 02 /
AVILA, Mario Luiz Novaes Rua da Assembléia n° 38 - 6° andar Centro CEP: 20011-000 Rio de Janeiro - RJ / BR | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Patentree Edificio Net Rua de Salazares, 842 4149-002 Porto / PT | [2021/01] | Application number, filing date | 19760580.1 | 01.03.2019 | [2021/01] | WO2019BR50065 | Priority number, date | BR20181004125 | 01.03.2018 Original published format: BR102018004125 | [2021/01] | Filing language | PT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019165529 | Date: | 06.09.2019 | Language: | PT | [2019/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3760553 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | BR | 06.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65D41/04, B65D51/22, B65D41/62, B65D47/08, B65D5/74 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
B65D47/08 (EP,BR);
B65D51/20 (BR);
B65D51/225 (EP);
B65D2401/15 (BR);
B65D47/122 (BR)
|
Former IPC [2021/01] | B65D41/04, B65D51/22, B65D41/62 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN ÖFFNEN VON BEHÄLTERN MIT MITTELN ZUM BRECHEN DES VERSIEGELUNGSELEMENTS DES BEHÄLTERS | [2021/01] | English: | DEVICE FOR AUTOMATICALLY OPENING CONTAINERS INCLUDING MEANS FOR BREAKING THE SEALING ELEMENT OF THE CONTAINER | [2021/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'OUVERTURE AUTOMATIQUE D'UN RÉCIPIENT POURVU DE MOYENS POUR LA RUPTURE D'UN ÉLÉMENT DE FERMETURE HERMÉTIQUE D'UN RÉCIPIENT | [2021/01] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2020 | Translation filed | 30.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 27.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/47] | 05.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]GB2440525 (MARS INC [US]) [I] 1 * figures 1-5 * [A] 3,4; | [A]US2014175099 (SEGUIN FRANCK [FR]) [A] 1-4 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]WO03035491 (REXAM MEDICAL PACKAGING INC [US], et al) [A] 1,5 * figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2016200491 (DUBACH WERNER F [CH]) [A] 1,4,5 * figures 1-13 *; | [A]US2012255952 (KNIERBEIN BERND [DE], et al) [A] 1-5 * figures 1-8 * | International search | [X]WO9962776 (CROWN CORK & SEAL TECH CORP [US], et al) [X] 1 a 2 * Resumo, Descrição, paginas 5-10, e figuras 1-8 *; | [Y]US6398075 (LACIACERA MAURO [IT], et al) [Y] 1 a 2 * Resumo, Descrição, colunas 3-7, e figuras 5-8 *; | [Y]BRPI0605619 (RIBEIRO OLINDO JR [BR]) [Y] 1 a 2 * Resumo, Descrição, paginas 5-6, e figura 4 *; | [A]BRPI0610767 (SACMI [IT]) [A] 1 a 2* Resumo, Descrição, paginas 13-15, 23 e 28, e figuras 20 e 25 * | by applicant | WO03035491 | WO2016082008 |