EP3758648 - DEVICES AND SYSTEMS FOR TREATMENT OF URINARY INCONTINENCE, AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The United States Government as represented by the Department of Veterans Affairs 810 Vermont Avenue NW Washington, DC 20420 / US | For all designated states Wayne State University 656 West Kirby Detroit, MI 48202 / US | For all designated states Toepper, Tino Petersgraben 35 4003 Basel / CH | For all designated states Osmani, Bekim Petersgraben 35 4003 Basel / CH | For all designated states Mueller, Bert Petersgraben 35 4003 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2021/01] | For all designated states The United States Government as Represented by The Department of Veterans Affairs 810 Vermont Avenue NW Washington, DC 20420 / US | ||
For all designated states Wayne State University 656 West Kirby Detroit, MI 48202 / US | |||
For all designated states Toepper, Tino Petersgraben 35 4003 Basel / CH | |||
For all designated states Osmani, Bekim Petersgraben 35 4003 Basel / CH | |||
For all designated states Mueller, Bert Petersgraben 35 4003 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAJERUS, Steven 810 Vermont Avenue NW Washington, DC 20420 / US | 02 /
RICKLI, Jeremy 656 West Kirby Street Detroit, MI 48202 / US | 03 /
DHAR, Nivedita 810 Vermont Avenue NW Washington, DC 20420 / US | 04 /
TOEPPER, Tino Petersgraben 35 4003 Basel / CH | 05 /
OSMANI, Bekim Petersgraben 35 4003 Basel / CH | 06 /
MUELLER, Bert Petersgraben 35 4003 Basel / CH | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | CH Kilger Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Fasanenstraße 29 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/01] | CH Kilger Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Fasanenstrasse 29 10719 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 19761249.2 | 01.03.2019 | [2021/01] | WO2019US20318 | Priority number, date | US201862637707P | 02.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862637707 P | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019169277 | Date: | 06.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3758648 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G16H20/40 | [2021/48] | CPC: |
G16H40/67 (EP,US);
A61F2/004 (EP,US);
A61B5/0022 (EP,US);
A61B5/0538 (EP);
A61B5/205 (EP,US);
A61F2/0036 (EP);
G16H20/40 (EP);
A61B2560/0219 (EP);
A61F2250/0001 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/01] | A61F2/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN UND SYSTEME ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HARNINKONTINENZ UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2021/01] | English: | DEVICES AND SYSTEMS FOR TREATMENT OF URINARY INCONTINENCE, AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING SAME | [2021/01] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ET SYSTÈMES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE L'INCONTINENCE URINAIRE ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LEUR PRODUCTION ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2021/01] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 16.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 16.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/09] | 24.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2004172087 (FORSELL PETER [CH]) [Y] 11-14 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0073] *[A] 1-10,15,16; | [XYI]US2009259093 (BHAT NIKHIL D [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6-8,10 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0086] * [Y] 11-14 [I] 3-5,9,15,16 | International search | [Y]US6135945 (SULTAN HASHEM [US]) [Y] 9, 15/(9), 16/(9), 17/(9) * see especially col 7, In 16-49, fig 5,6 *; | [Y]WO2004037082 (UROVID PTY LTD [AU], et al) [Y] 2-5, 15/(2-5, 16/(2-5), 17/(2-5) * see especially pg 5, In 23-27, pg 8, In 29 to pg 9, In 2, pg 12, In 16 to pg 13, In 5, In pg 13, In 14-32 *; | [A]US2005240144 (WASSEMANN HELMUT [DE], et al) [A] 1-17* see whole document *; | [A]US2012157759 (WIRBISKY ALAN G [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * see whole document *; | [XY]US2015202034 (SEEBACH MICHAEL [DE], et al) [X] 1, 6-8, 10-14, 15/(1, 6-8, 10-14), 16/(1, 6-8, 10-14), 17/(1, 6-8, 10-14) * see especially para [0007], [0009], [0012], [0015]-[0018], [0021], [0022], [0030], [0031], [0041, [0044], fig 1 * [Y] 2-5, 9, 15/(2-5, 9), 16/(2-5, 9), 17/(7-5, 9); | [A]US2015374288 (LAMRAOUI HAMID [FR], et al) [A] 1-17 * see whole document * |