EP3760957 - AIR CONDITIONER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/01] | HEAT EXCHANGER | ||
[2022/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKANO, Hiroyuki c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome Kita-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 02 /
ANDOU, Tooru c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome Kita-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 03 /
KUSAKA, Hideyuki c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome Kita-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 04 /
YOSHIOKA, Shun c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome Kita-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Global IP Europe Patentanwaltskanzlei Pfarrstraße 14 80538 München / DE | [2021/01] | Application number, filing date | 19761287.2 | 22.02.2019 | [2021/01] | WO2019JP06840 | Priority number, date | JP20180036981 | 01.03.2018 Original published format: JP 2018036981 | [2021/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019167839 | Date: | 06.09.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3760957 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3760957 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F28D1/053, F28F1/16, F28F3/12, F28F9/02, F28F1/22 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
F28D1/05391 (EP);
F28F1/26 (US);
F28D1/0246 (EP);
F28D1/05341 (EP);
F28F1/16 (EP);
F28F1/22 (EP);
F28D2021/0068 (EP);
F28F2270/00 (EP);
F28F3/12 (EP);
F28F9/0204 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/01] | F28D1/053, F28F1/16, F28F3/12, F28F9/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLIMAANLAGE | [2022/35] | English: | AIR CONDITIONER | [2022/35] | French: | APPAREIL DE CONDITIONNEMENT D'AIR | [2022/35] |
Former [2021/01] | WÄRMETAUSCHER | ||
Former [2021/01] | HEAT EXCHANGER | ||
Former [2021/01] | ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2020 | Translation filed | 11.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 11.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 25.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 30.11.2022 | AT | 30.11.2022 | CZ | 30.11.2022 | DK | 30.11.2022 | EE | 30.11.2022 | ES | 30.11.2022 | FI | 30.11.2022 | HR | 30.11.2022 | IT | 30.11.2022 | LT | 30.11.2022 | LV | 30.11.2022 | MC | 30.11.2022 | NL | 30.11.2022 | PL | 30.11.2022 | RO | 30.11.2022 | RS | 30.11.2022 | SE | 30.11.2022 | SI | 30.11.2022 | SK | 30.11.2022 | SM | 30.11.2022 | IE | 22.02.2023 | LU | 22.02.2023 | BE | 28.02.2023 | CH | 28.02.2023 | LI | 28.02.2023 | NO | 28.02.2023 | GR | 01.03.2023 | IS | 30.03.2023 | PT | 31.03.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/12] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
MC | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
IE | 22.02.2023 | ||
LU | 22.02.2023 | ||
BE | 28.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
MC | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
IE | 22.02.2023 | ||
LU | 22.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
MC | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
LU | 22.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
MC | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
LU | 22.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
MC | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/44] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
MC | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 30.11.2022 | |
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | DK | 30.11.2022 | |
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | DK | 30.11.2022 | |
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 30.11.2022 | |
NO | 28.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5411079 (SASAKI KENICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,9 * figures 1-3 * [I] 6; | [XAYI]EP0683371 (SANDEN CORP [JP]) [X] 1,4,5,8,9 * figures 6,7 * [A] 7 [Y] 3 [I] 2,6; | [XI]US2006237178 (KATOH YOSHIKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,8,9 * figures 9,15 * [I] 2,5,6; | [A]JP2014137172 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [A] 2 * figures 8-10 *; | [Y]DE112012005079T (DENSO CORP [JP]) [Y] 3* figure 32 * | International search | [Y]JPS59153493U (MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD.) [Y] 7-9 * , specification, page 3, lines 4-13, fig. 2 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPH06117790 (SANDEN CORP) [Y] 1-9 * , paragraphs [0009]-[0011], fig. 1-3 & US 5411079 A, column 3, lines 13-53, fig. 1-3 & US 5513432 A *; | [Y]JPH09159386 (SANDEN CORP) [Y] 1-9 * , paragraphs [0001], [0005]-[0007], fig. 1-3 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPH10300275 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [Y] 3-5, 7-9 * , paragraphs [0026]-[0028], fig. 1-3 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2001091101 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) [Y] 8-9 * , paragraphs [0012]-[0013], fig. 2 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2010117091 (DENSO CORP) [Y] 2-9 * , paragraph [0095], fig. 4 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2011122778 (TOSHIBA CARRIER CORP) [Y] 8-9 * , paragraph [0038], fig. 2-4 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2014137172 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [Y] 2-9 * , paragraphs [0071]-[0075], fig. 8-10 (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2016013100 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9* , entire text, all drawings & EP 3173725 A1 *; | [Y]WO2017221400 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 3-5, 7-9 * , paragraphs [0052]-[0054], fig. 2, 8 & CN 109312971 A * | by applicant | JP2006090636 |