Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN112055937 | Global Dossier | 08.12.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US20324 | 01.03.2019 | US201815909539 | 01.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3759807 | Global Dossier | 12.10.2022 | B1 | EP3759807 | 17.11.2021 | A4 | EP3759807 | 06.01.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US20324 | 01.03.2019 | US201815909539 | 01.03.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019169279 | Global Dossier | 06.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815909539 | 01.03.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10742179 | Global Dossier | 11.08.2020 | B2 | US2019273477 | 05.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815909539 | 01.03.2018 |